This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/27/2016 at 19:03:45 (UTC).

JOSE OROZCO, ET AL VS. BENJAMIN DONEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/03/2008 JOSE OROZCO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BENJAMIN DONEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROSE HOM and LAW & MOTION. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1813

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROSE HOM

LAW & MOTION

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

OROZCO MARTINA

OROZCO JOSE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DONEL BENJAMIN

SHERF GEORGE

EASY FINANCIAL LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

LENDER'S FORECLOSURE SERVICES

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN LOTTIE LAW OFFICE OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DOSS LAW

LAW OFFICES OF BITA GOODMAN & ASSOCIATES

NASSIE LAW

WOLF LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2011
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION WITH CONSENT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANT ) Filed by Atty for Plaintiff and Cross-Deft

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2010
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DATE OF THE OSC RE PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD/ JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • Declaration (RE SERVICE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION & ORD TO CONTINUE THE DATE OF THE OSC RE PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD/JUDGMT/DISM ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • Declaration (IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2010
  • Notice (OF NON-AVAILABILITY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE THE OSC RE PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD/ JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • Opposition (TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2008
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • Default Entered Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • Request for Entry of Default Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2008
  • Proof of Service (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2008
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LENDER'S FORECLOSURE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where EASY FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT is a litigant