This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 15:30:43 (UTC).

JOSE MURO ET AL VS GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/23/2011 JOSE MURO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9910

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ FRANCISCO

MURO ANDRES

MURO JOSE

Defendants

DAVIS GILDA

DOES 1 TO 100

EARL JENNIFER

GLENDALE POLICE DEPT.

GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

LAPD

DEPT. GLENDALE POLICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLD RONALD ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; Status Conference (Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30; (Status Hearing; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Glendale Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Jose Muro (Legacy Party); Andres Muro (Legacy Party); Francisco Martinez (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2011
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APP OFFITMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMCIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Jose Muro (Legacy Party); Andres Muro (Legacy Party); Francisco Martinez (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2011
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT GLENDALE POLICE is a litigant

Latest cases where LAPD Officers # 1-4 is a litigant

Latest cases where GLENDALE UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLD RONALD ESQ.