This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 08:59:57 (UTC).

JOSE MOYA VS RAY CAMMACK SHOWS INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/20/2015 JOSE MOYA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RAY CAMMACK SHOWS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR, WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, AMY D. HOGUE and YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1897

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

AMY D. HOGUE

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MOYA JOSE

MARTINEZ ALEJANDRO BC634333

Defendants and Respondents

DOES ONE THROUGH AND INCLUDING DOE TEN

LEAVITT GUY W.

PICKETT BEN

PICKETT JOY LEAVITT

RAY CAMMACK SHOWS INC.

TRINITY CONCESSIONS LLC

Other

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BRIANA KIM PC

KIM BRIANA M

RICASA JONATHAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GARRETT & JENSEN

JENSEN BOYD FECHSER II

JOHNSON KENNETH EDWIN

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

 

Court Documents

Request

1/25/2018: Request

Order

1/26/2018: Order

Other -

1/30/2018: Other -

Other -

1/31/2018: Other -

Complaint

2/9/2018: Complaint

Exhibit List

2/22/2018: Exhibit List

Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

2/22/2018: Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/16/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

3/16/2018: Minute Order

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

4/4/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Exhibit List

4/4/2018: Exhibit List

Minute Order

4/23/2018: Minute Order

Other -

4/23/2018: Other -

Other -

4/23/2018: Other -

Other -

6/15/2018: Other -

Legacy Document

9/17/2018: Legacy Document

Stipulation and Order

1/4/2019: Stipulation and Order

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/15/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketOrder (Re Court Approval of Proposed Distribution of Unclaimed Class Action Settlement Funds); Filed by Martinez, Alejandro BC634333 (Plaintiff); Jose Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Martinez, Alejandro BC634333 (Plaintiff); Jose Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jonathan Ricasa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketOrder/Ruling Re Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Fairness Hearing - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Wil S. Wilcox, CSR No. 9187); Filed by Martinez, Alejandro BC634333 (Plaintiff); Jose Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Fairness Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Response to Motion for Final Approval; Filed by Martinez, Alejandro BC634333 (Plaintiff); Jose Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Response to Motion for Final Approval; Filed by Ray Cammack Shows, Inc. (Defendant); Guy W. Leavitt (Defendant); Trinity Concessions LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketOther - (of Exhibits in support of Motion For Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Incentive Awards, Attorneys' Fees, and Costs); Filed by Jose Moya (Plaintiff); Martinez, Alejandro BC634333 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-12-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 322; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2015-12-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jose Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jose Moya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT [CLASS ACTION] 1. CAL. LAB. CODE 226 7, 512-MEAL PERIOD AND REST BREAK VIOLATIONS; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Moya (Plaintiff); Martinez, Alejandro BC634333 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAY CAMMACK SHOWS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THEODORA ORINGHER PC is a litigant