This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2021 at 05:28:12 (UTC).

JOSE LUIS RODRIGUEZ ET AL VS FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY INC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2012 JOSE LUIS RODRIGUEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR, EMILIE H. ELIAS and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1770

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

EMILIE H. ELIAS

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BERGIADIS ALEX

ENRIQUEZ ROBERT

KNISS BRIAN

MANCILLAS SANTIAGO

RODRIGUEZ JOSE LUIS

Defendants

AMERICAN BLOWER COMPANY

AMERICAN STANDARD INCORPORATED

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

DOES 1 THROUGH 400 INCLUSIVE

FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY INC.

GARDNER DENVER MACHINERY INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

INGERSOL-RAND COMPANY

KEWANEE BOILER CORP.

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSIT

LOYA CASUALTY INSRUANCE COMPANY

TERRY STEAM TURBINE COMPANY

TRANE U.S. INCORPORATED

YARWAY CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FALVEY THOMAS W. LAW OFFICES OF

HUERTA EMILIO J. ESQ.

IRWIN ALAN D.

SOTTILE TIMOTHY B. ESQ.

SOTTILE BALTAXE APLC

Defendant Attorneys

GRUBE BROWN & GELDT LLP

PAUL HASTINGS LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. UNPAID WAGES [LABOR CODE SECTIONSS 216 AND 1194]; ETC.

9/7/2012: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. UNPAID WAGES [LABOR CODE SECTIONSS 216 AND 1194]; ETC.

SUMMONS -

9/7/2012: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

11/6/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

Proof of Service -

11/6/2012: Proof of Service -

NOTICE OF APPEAL OF COURT?S ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS OF ALEX BERGIADIS, TO STAY ACTION, AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

6/10/2013: NOTICE OF APPEAL OF COURT?S ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS? MOTION TO SEVER CLAIMS OF ALEX BERGIADIS, TO STAY ACTION, AND TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

APPELLANT?S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

6/10/2013: APPELLANT?S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE)

NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

6/11/2013: NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

6/26/2013: NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

REMITTITUR

1/12/2015: REMITTITUR

Status Report - JOINT REPORT FOR AUGUST 26, 2016 NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW

8/24/2016: Status Report - JOINT REPORT FOR AUGUST 26, 2016 NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW

Minute Order -

8/26/2016: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/5/2017: Minute Order -

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND4 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DEADLINES AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/6/2017: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND4 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND TRIAL-RELATED DEADLINES AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Complaint - -THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. UNPAID WAGES (LABOR CODE -- 216 and 1194); 2. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (LABOR CODE,-1194 et SEQ.)

7/13/2017: Complaint - -THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. UNPAID WAGES (LABOR CODE -- 216 and 1194); 2. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE (LABOR CODE,-1194 et SEQ.)

Answer - -DEFENDANTS FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. AND LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/25/2017: Answer - -DEFENDANTS FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY, INC. AND LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' UNVERIFIED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal - -

8/8/2017: Request for Dismissal - -

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - -

8/21/2017: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service - -

Motion for Summary Adjudication - DEFENDANT FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS TWELFTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

9/28/2017: Motion for Summary Adjudication - DEFENDANT FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON ITS TWELFTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 310; (Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 310; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 310; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketCase File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Jose Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Settlement -NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2012
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Fred Loya Insurance Agency, Inc. (Defendant); Loya Casualty Insruance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Robert Enriquez (Plaintiff); Brian Kniss (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Jose Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Robert Enriquez (Plaintiff); Brian Kniss (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2012
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 311; Court Order (Court Order; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2012
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. UNPAID WAGES [LABOR CODE SECTIONSS 216 AND 1194]; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Luis Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Robert Enriquez (Plaintiff); Brian Kniss (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEWANEE BOILER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where TERRY STEAM TURBINE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where FRED LOYA INSURANCE AGENCY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where YARWAY CORPORATION is a litigant