Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 19:21:42 (UTC).

JOSE J MARTINEZ VS MOC PRODUCTS COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2015 JOSE J MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MOC PRODUCTS COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, EMILIE H. ELIAS, ANN I. JONES and JANE JOHNSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3341

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

EMILIE H. ELIAS

ANN I. JONES

JANE JOHNSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARTINEZ JOSE J

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-100

MOC PRODUCTS COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THE NOURMAND LAW FIRM APC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

OZHEKIM GREG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/24/2015: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

2/24/2015: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

NOTICE OF PETITION/MOTION AND PETITION/MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS OF JACQUELIN "JACKIE" GREENE AND SUSAN K. LAFFER

5/5/2015: NOTICE OF PETITION/MOTION AND PETITION/MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS OF JACQUELIN "JACKIE" GREENE AND SUSAN K. LAFFER

ADDENDUM OF FEDERAL CASES CITED IN DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PETITION/MOTION AND PETITION/MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION: ETC.

5/5/2015: ADDENDUM OF FEDERAL CASES CITED IN DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PETITION/MOTION AND PETITION/MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION: ETC.

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/24/2015: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration

3/16/2017: Declaration

Minute Order

3/17/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 308; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Jose J Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Declaration DECLARATION OF JARROD SALINAS REGARDING DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Case File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 308; Fairness Hearing - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Motion for Final Approval of Settlement MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by Jose J Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Case File - Public

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Minute Order MINUTES ENTERED 09/09/16

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2015
  • NOTICE OF PETITION/MOTION AND PETITION/MOTION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND SUPPORTING DECLARATIONS OF JACQUELIN "JACKIE" GREENE AND SUSAN K. LAFFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Jose J Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 308; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 324; (Order ReReassignment of Case; Case is reassigned) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 322; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Transferred to different departmnt) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Jose J Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Jose J Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RESTITUTION 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOC PRODUCTS COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICE OF GREG OZHEKIM