This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2021 at 19:44:23 (UTC).

JOSE GUTIERREZ VS EDWARD Y LEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/12/2013 JOSE GUTIERREZ filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against EDWARD Y LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1692

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GUTIERREZ JOSE

Defendants and Respondents

BRIAN D. LERNER

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN D LERNER

LEE & FIELDS

LEE EDWARD Y

LEE & FIELDS APC

LEE EDWARD Y.

LERNER BRIAN D.

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN D. LERNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FOBKE SHIRLEY

IMIG JEFFREY A.

PLC HARALSON MILLER PITT FELDMAN

SHIRLEY A. FOBKE ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LEE EDWARD Y. ESQ.

SAUNDERS JENNIFER K.

LEE & FIELDS APC

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

9/5/2013: NOTICE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

9/30/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

Minute Order -

12/18/2013: Minute Order -

NOTICE

1/7/2014: NOTICE

REQUEST TO ADJUST DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/29/2014: REQUEST TO ADJUST DATE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

2/5/2014: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

2/6/2014: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/2/2014: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS COUNSEL OF RECORD

5/27/2014: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS COUNSEL OF RECORD

PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/15/2014: PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

10/17/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARIE GOMEZ

10/28/2014: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARIE GOMEZ

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

12/16/2014: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF EDWARD Y. LEE IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSFD] ORDER

1/23/2015: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY ACTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATION OF EDWARD Y. LEE IN SUPPORT THEREOF; [PROPOSFD] ORDER

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARIE GOMEZ

4/10/2015: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARIE GOMEZ

Minute Order -

6/8/2015: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

1/5/2016: Minute Order -

NOTICE RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/21/2016: NOTICE RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 17; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17; (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jose Gutierrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE AND FIELDS AN BUSINESS ENTITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Kay Saunders

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE EDWARD YOUNG