This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 00:14:16 (UTC).

JOSE E. LEON VS. LILLIAN M. NODA

Case Summary

On 11/14/2016 JOSE E LEON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LILLIAN M NODA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5928

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEON JOSE E. AN INDIVIDUAL

LEON PETRA P. TRUSTEE OF THE LEON

LEON JOSE E. TRUSTEE OF THE LEON FAMILY

LEON JOSE

LEON PETRA

Defendant

NODA LILLIAN M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

VELASCO LAW GROUP

RADCLIFFE RICHARD JAMES

Defendant Attorney

TONY FORBERG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

12/5/2016: Unknown

Unknown

1/30/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

7/13/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

7/20/2017: Unknown

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

9/6/2017: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default

Unknown

9/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/28/2017: Unknown

Unknown

9/28/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

10/12/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/3/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

5/7/2018: Unknown

Stipulation

8/17/2018: Stipulation

Minute Order

8/20/2018: Minute Order

Notice

8/21/2018: Notice

Minute Order

1/8/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/1/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/5/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

3/18/2019: Unknown

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 03/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by PETRA LEON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion - Other (to ve relieved as attorney) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department C; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Order (re: submitted matter); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-05-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by JOSE LEON (Plaintiff); PETRA LEON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by JOSE LEON (Plaintiff); PETRA LEON (Plaintiff); LEON, JOSE E., trustee of The Leon Family (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Request for Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JOSE LEON (Plaintiff); PETRA LEON (Plaintiff); LEON, JOSE E., trustee of The Leon Family (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by JOSE LEON (Plaintiff); PETRA LEON (Plaintiff); LEON, JOSE E., trustee of The Leon Family (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOSE LEON (Plaintiff); PETRA LEON (Plaintiff); LEON, JOSE E., trustee of The Leon Family (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by JOSE LEON (Plaintiff); PETRA LEON (Plaintiff); LEON, JOSE E., trustee of The Leon Family (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC065928    Hearing Date: July 16, 2020    Dept: SEC

LEON v. NODA

CASE NO.: VC065928

HEARING: 07/16/2020

[Remote appearances are encouraged and will be given priority.]

#13

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiff PETRA P. LEON, as an individual, as Trustee of THE LEON FAMILY TRUST, dated April 15, 2013, and as Executor of the Estate of Jose E. Leon’s unopposed Motion to Enforce Settlement and Enter Judgment against Defendant LILLIAN M. NODA is GRANTED. CCP § 664.6.

Moving Party to give Notice.

No Opposition filed as of July 14, 2020. Due by July 2, 2020. (CCP §1005(b).)

Plaintiff and Defendant settled this matter on or about February 22, 2019. Plaintiff has attached a copy of the written agreement between the parties. (See Radcliffe Decl., ¶2 Ex.1.)

The unopposed motion to enforce settlement and enter judgment against Defendant LILLIAN M. NODA is GRANTED pursuant to CCP §664.6.

Plaintiff also requests an award of reasonable attorneys’ fees and court costs. A party may recover its costs, including attorney’s fees, when authorized by contract. (CCP §1033.5.) The Settlement Agreement executed by the parties entitles Plaintiff to recover her reasonable attorney’s fees and costs in connection with enforcement of the Settlement Agreement. “Each of the Parties shall bear his, hers or its own attorney’s fees, costs and expenses in or related to the Action, except to enforce the terms and conditions of this Agreement.” (emphasis added.) (See Radcliffe Decl., ¶2 Ex.1.) Plaintiff’s request is GRANTED:

Defendant LILLIAN M. NODA is ORDERED to pay Plaintiff PETRA P. LEON, as an individual, as Trustee of THE LEON FAMILY TRUST, dated April 15, 2013, and as Executor of the Estate of Jose E. Leon, and her counsel of record, reasonable attorney’s fees and costs in the total amount of $2,060.00 ($400/hr. x 5 hrs.) ($60 costs) no later than 30 days from the Court’s issuance of this Order.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TONY FORBERG ESQ.