This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2019 at 10:39:06 (UTC).

JOSE CARCAMO ET. AL. VS. CALIBER COLLISION CENTERS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2014 JOSE CARCAMO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALIBER COLLISION CENTERS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALLAN J. GOODMAN, NANCY L. NEWMAN and H. CHESTER HORN, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2653

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

NANCY L. NEWMAN

H. CHESTER HORN, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARROYO JUAN

BABALLERO MARIO

BARCENAS BERNARDO

CARCAMO JOSE

DEL CID ABELINO

IBANEZ JOSE FALCON

MACIAS GERARDO

OCHOA DONALD

ZAMORA ROB

CABALLERO MARIO

Defendant

CALIBER COLLISION CENTER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KASHFIAN ROBERT A.

BITTON OPHIR J.

Defendant Attorney

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/24/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/24/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

4/24/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

12/21/2017: Minute Order

Unknown

12/21/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/31/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

6/19/2018: Unknown

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/19/2018: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order

6/29/2018: Minute Order

Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

8/7/2018: Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Dismiss

8/31/2018: Motion to Dismiss

Request for Judicial Notice

8/31/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order

9/27/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

11/28/2018: Declaration

Notice

4/17/2019: Notice

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by CALIBER COLLISION CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Judgment (Proposed Judgment); Filed by CALIBER COLLISION CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (plaintiffs' complaint) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Defendant Caliber Collision Centers, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Opposition (DEFENDANT CALIBER COLLISION CENTERS, INC.?S SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF?S NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS? COMPLAINT); Filed by CALIBER COLLISION CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (Re: ex Parte Application to Specially Set Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Continue Trial); Filed by CALIBER COLLISION CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Defendant Caliber Collision centers, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application to Specially set Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Minute Order ((Defendant Caliber Collision Centers, Inc.'s Ex Parte Applicat...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2014
  • Declaration; Filed by CALIBER COLLISION CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Motion to Compel (AND REQUST FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS "BY FAX" ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Declaration (OF ANGELES PAK IN SUPPORT OF CALIBER COLLISION CENTERS, INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION "BY FAX" ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Motion to Compel; Filed by CALIBER COLLISION CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by JOSE CARCAMO (Plaintiff); DONALD OCHOA (Plaintiff); ABELINO DEL CID (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Summons; Filed by JOSE CARCAMO (Plaintiff); DONALD OCHOA (Plaintiff); ABELINO DEL CID (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Complaint; Filed by JOSE CARCAMO (Plaintiff); DONALD OCHOA (Plaintiff); ABELINO DEL CID (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less