This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 13:51:08 (UTC).

JOSE BUNGE ET. AL. VS. 511 OFW ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2008 JOSE BUNGE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 511 OFW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL, NORMAN P. TARLE, TERRY B. FRIEDMAN and PATRICIA M. SCHNEGG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0361

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

NORMAN P. TARLE

TERRY B. FRIEDMAN

PATRICIA M. SCHNEGG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUNGE VICTORIA

BUNGE JOSE

Claimants

KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE

JARDINI ANDRE

HARRIS STEPHEN M.

GARCIA STEVEN RAY

Defendants

JOSEPH PRASKE

BOARDWALK SUNSET

PRASKE JOSEPH J.

511 OFW

GAGGERO STEVE

GINGERBREAD COURT

COURT GINGERBREAD

SUNSET BOARDWALK

PRASKE JOSEPH

Not Classified By Court

NEWMAN HON. JACK M. (RETIRED)

NEWMAN HON. JACK M. RETIRED

Trustees

DAVID A. EQUIBIAS

EQUIBIAS DAVID A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BEECHEN PAUL D.

POLK CHRISTOPHER

Claimant Attorney

WAKILY AUSTA

Defendant Attorneys

WESTLAKE LAW GROUP

ANDREWS JOHN E.

BLECHER & COLLINS

BLECHER COLLINS PEPPERMAN & JOYE

Trustee Attorney

HOFFMAN EDWARD A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

11/26/2012: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF LIEN

9/4/2012: NOTICE OF LIEN

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department J; (Court's Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department WEJ, Norman P. Tarle, Presiding; Court's Order to Show Cause (Re: Trial Exhibits to be Picked-UpFrom Counsel for Defendants) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department J; (Court's Order to Show Cause; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2015
  • Docketat 09:00 am in Department WEJ, Norman P. Tarle, Presiding; Court's Order to Show Cause (RE: TRIAL EXHIBITS TO BE PICKED-UP BY COUNSEL FROM BOTH SIDES ORDESTROYED BY THE CLERK) - OSC Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department J; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Docketat 01:30 pm in Department WEJ, Norman P. Tarle, Presiding; Court Order - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement (Motion - Enforce Settlement; Continued-Request-Moving Party) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department WEJ, Norman P. Tarle, Presiding; Motion - Enforce Settlement (Defendant / Cross-ComplainantsMotion to Enforce SettlementAgreemetn Pursuant to CCP Section664.6) - Continued-Request-Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DocketReply; Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
745 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2008
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TED FLOKERT AND EXHIBITS THERETO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT GNGERBREAD COURT LP'S MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2008
  • DocketNotice of Motion (1.(GINGERBREAD COURT) TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS 2.(BOARDWALK SUNSET) TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • DocketNotice of Pendency; Filed by JOSE BUNGE (Plaintiff); VICTORIA BUNGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • DocketNotice of Pendency; Filed by JOSE BUNGE (Plaintiff); VICTORIA BUNGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • DocketNotice of Pendency; Filed by JOSE BUNGE (Plaintiff); VICTORIA BUNGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • DocketNotice of Pendency (AGAINST 511 OCEAN FRONT WALK, VENICE. CALIFORNIA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • DocketNotice of Pendency (AGAINST 517 OCEAN FRONT WALK, VENICE, CALIFORNIA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2008
  • DocketNotice of Pendency (AGAINST 601 OCEAN FRONT WALK, VENICE CALIFORNIA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOSE BUNGE (Plaintiff); VICTORIA BUNGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 511 OFW L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE is a litigant