This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2019 at 14:21:33 (UTC).

JOSE RIVERA A VS CITY OF INGLEWOOD

Case Summary

On 08/25/2015 JOSE RIVERA A filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF INGLEWOOD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAMONA G. SEE, DAVID SOTELO, ROBERT B. BROADBELT and STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1572

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAMONA G. SEE

DAVID SOTELO

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RIVERA JOSE A.

RIVERA JOSE A

Defendants and Respondents

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

INGLEWOOD CITY OF

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

DOES 1 TO 50

CITY OF INGLEWOOD

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

VAZIRI LAW GROUP A.P.C.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ETHAN L. ROBINSON SR.DEPUTY CITY ATTY

VUONG NENA T. DEPUTY ATTORNEY

ROBINSON ETHAN L. SR. DEPUTY CITY ATTY

JENNY HSIEH/KENNETH R. CAMPOS

NENA T. VUONG DEPUTY ATTORNEY

THOMAS M. MADRUGA

CAMPOS JENNY HSIEH/KENNETH R.

MADRUGA THOMAS M.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/2/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

8/25/2015: SUMMONS

UNLIMITED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

8/25/2015: UNLIMITED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/16/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/16/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/22/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/22/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/22/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLE WOOD?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

11/12/2015: DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLE WOOD?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA

11/17/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT STATE OF CALIFORNIA

ANSWER OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/30/2015: ANSWER OF THE CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Unknown

12/2/2015: Unknown

NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLEWOOD'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES TO CITY DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/14/2015: NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLEWOOD'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES TO CITY DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLEWOOD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

1/12/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT CITY OF INGLEWOOD; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/29/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

2/1/2016: ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

Minute Order

2/1/2016: Minute Order

Unknown

4/7/2016: Unknown

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; (OSC-Failure to File Request for Dism; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JOSE A RIVERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT; ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference (J/T - 11/8/17) - Cause off-calendar, settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by JOSE A RIVERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose A. Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jose A. Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • UNLIMITED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. PREMISES LIABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by JOSE A RIVERA (Plaintiff); Jose A. Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.