This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 20:00:00 (UTC).

JORGE DONIS VS PRESTIGE PROPERTY SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JORGE DONIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PRESTIGE PROPERTY SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA, MONICA BACHNER and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1971

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUZANNE G. BRUGUERA

MONICA BACHNER

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DONIS JORGE

Defendants and Respondents

LASTRA VICTOR

BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES INC.

GUZMAN JESSE

DOE ARNULFO

AVALON PRESTIGE

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

DOE ALEJANDRO

PRESTIGE PROPERTY SERVICES INC.

LEYVA ARNULFO

LEYVA ALEJANDRO

AGUAYO VICTOR

PRESTIGE AVALON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF JAKE D. FINKEL APC

LAW OFFICES OF ALLISON M. SCHULMAN

JAKE D. FINKEL APC

ALLISON M. SCHULMAN LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GORDON & REES LLP

HINSHAW & CULBERTSON LLP

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

2/26/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/9/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/15/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

3/16/2016: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CODE CIV. PROC., ? 170.6)

DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/21/2016: DEFENDANT BARRETT BUSINESS SERVICES, INC.'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/5/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

6/9/2016: Unknown

Minute Order

7/26/2016: Minute Order

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

8/12/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

9/9/2016: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

12/8/2016: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Proof of Service

1/26/2017: Proof of Service

DECLARATION OF ALLISON M. SCHULMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ETC.

1/26/2017: DECLARATION OF ALLISON M. SCHULMAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/15/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

2/28/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/9/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 71; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 71; Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 71; Court Order (Court Order; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • at 3:00 PM in Department 71; Court Order - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jorge Donis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jorge Donis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jorge Donis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. ASSAULT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less