This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/04/2016 at 17:34:49 (UTC).

JORDAN KHRISTIAN FORD VS. MOUNTAIN VALLEY EXPRESS CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2012 JORDAN KHRISTIAN FORD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MOUNTAIN VALLEY EXPRESS CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, GREGORY KEOSIAN and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6346

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

GREGORY KEOSIAN

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 100 INCLUSIVE

MOUNTAIN VALLEY EXPRESS CO. INC.

Cross Defendant

CONERLY JR. JOHN

Minor

FORD JORDAN KHRISTIAN

Guardian Ad Litem

FORD BOBBIE

Other

COMPTON SUPERIOR COURT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LA FOLLETTE JOHNSON DE HAAS FESLER

Minor Attorney

NORDSTROM STEELE NICOLETTE AND BLYTHE

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF FRANCIS P. PAPICA, ESQ. IN REFERENCE TO THE OSC RE DISMISSAL (PROOF OF DEPOSIT FOLLOWING APPROVAL OF MINOR?S COMPROMISE) AND ORDER THEREON

7/28/2014: DECLARATION OF FRANCIS P. PAPICA, ESQ. IN REFERENCE TO THE OSC RE DISMISSAL (PROOF OF DEPOSIT FOLLOWING APPROVAL OF MINOR?S COMPROMISE) AND ORDER THEREON

Minute Order

6/25/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/25/2014: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING-ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

9/29/2014: NOTICE OF RULING-ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE

AMENDED ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

3/6/2014: AMENDED ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

3/6/2014: ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY

Minute Order

2/21/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/6/2014: Minute Order

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DLSPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF T JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISA5I[JTYSC

1/28/2014: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DLSPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF T JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISA5I[JTYSC

DECLARATION OF FRANCIS P. PAPICA, ESQ. IN REFERENCE TO THE OSC RE DISMISSAL (PROOF OF DEPOSIT FOLLOWING APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE) AND ORDER THEREON

7/22/2014: DECLARATION OF FRANCIS P. PAPICA, ESQ. IN REFERENCE TO THE OSC RE DISMISSAL (PROOF OF DEPOSIT FOLLOWING APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE) AND ORDER THEREON

RULING RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR?S COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

2/21/2014: RULING RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR?S COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

6/12/2013: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/26/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A D1SAB1LITY

7/26/2013: PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR MINOR OR PERSON WITH A D1SAB1LITY

Minute Order

6/18/2014: Minute Order

EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FOR MINOR; ETC.

3/6/2014: EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FOR MINOR; ETC.

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNEMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

4/5/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNEMENT TO PI COURT AND ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

Minute Order

6/18/2013: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2014
  • Notice of Ruling (OF DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE; ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (w/prej, complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Declaration (OF FRANCIS P PAPICA ESQ. IN REFERENCE TO THE OSC RE DISMISSAL (PROOF OF DEPOSIT FOLLOWING APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE) AND ORDER THEREON ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Declaration (OF FRANCIS P. PAPICA, ESQ. IN REFORANCE TO THE OSC RE: DISMISSAL (PROOF OF DEPOSIT FOLLOWING APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE)AND ORDER THEREON; ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • Receipt-Deposit Funds-Blocked Acct Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds (EX PARTE AMENDED ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Ord-Approving Compromise (EX PARTE AMENDED ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • Ex-Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FOR MINOR ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Petition-Hrg Minor's Compromise (PETITIONER: BOBBIE FORD CLAIMANT: JORDAN KHRISTIAN FORD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (ON COMPLAINT, COMPLAINT, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ON CROSS- COMPLAINT, CROSS-COMPLAINT ****FILING CANCELLED*** NOT VALID NO DECLARATION RE DILIGENCE AS TO SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued (MOUNTAIN VALLEY EXPRESS CO., INC. VS JOHN CONERLY, JR. and ROES 1 thorugh 10, Inclusive ) Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (& APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM, and STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2012
  • Pet for Appt of Gdn Ad Litem - Ord (BOBBIE FORD is appointed as G.A.L. for Jordan Khristian Ford ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Complaint Fld - No Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.