This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 02:14:10 (UTC).

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC VS PCS LINK INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/05/2016 JONATHAN NEIL ASSOCIATES INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PCS LINK INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5936

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendants and Respondents

GREENWOOD & HALL

PCS LINK INC.

GREENWOOD HALL INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

GREENWOOD HALL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HATKOFF & MINASSIAN A LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

3/8/2018: RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

SUMMONS

7/5/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. FOR GOODS AND SERVICES SOLD AND DELIVERED; ETC

7/5/2016: COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. FOR GOODS AND SERVICES SOLD AND DELIVERED; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/29/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/29/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/6/2016: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Unknown

9/6/2016: Unknown

Unknown

10/17/2016: Unknown

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

10/17/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/19/2016: STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order

10/19/2016: Minute Order

ORDER FOR COURT TO DISMISS CASE AND RETAIN JURISDICTION PENDING COMPLETION OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (C.C.P. ?664.6)

10/19/2016: ORDER FOR COURT TO DISMISS CASE AND RETAIN JURISDICTION PENDING COMPLETION OF STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (C.C.P. ?664.6)

CIVIL DEPOSIT

11/15/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

11/15/2016: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Unknown

12/15/2016: Unknown

ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

8/9/2017: ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

Minute Order

8/9/2017: Minute Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Writ of Execution; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 19; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Order; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • ORDER TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NATALIA A. MINASSIAN IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL PREVIOUSLY ENTERED AND FOR JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION PURSUANT TO WAIVER OF NOTICE UNDER STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jonathan Neil & Associates, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY 1. FOR GOODS AND SERVICES SOLD AND DELIVERED; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PCS Link, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Greenwood Hall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JONATHAN NEIL & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant