Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 21:03:36 (UTC).

JONATHAN GHOBRIAL VS SAM FAHMY ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2013 JONATHAN GHOBRIAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SAM FAHMY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8942

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GHOBRIAL JONATHAN

Defendants and Respondents

CAPITAL EAGLE SECURITY INC.

DOES 1-50

FAHMY RINDALA

FAHMY SAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MOTAZ M. GERGES

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

REYES JORGE H. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

1/11/2013: SUMMONS -

Proof of Service -

1/24/2013: Proof of Service -

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1)FALURE TO PAY OVERTIMEWAGES IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE ? 1194; 2) FAL(JRE TO PROVIDE MEAL AND REST PERIODS [N VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE ?226.7; ETC

2/11/2013: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1)FALURE TO PAY OVERTIMEWAGES IN VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE ? 1194; 2) FAL(JRE TO PROVIDE MEAL AND REST PERIODS [N VIOLATION OF LABOR CODE ?226.7; ETC

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/14/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT(S) ANSWER

3/26/2013: DEFENDANT(S) ANSWER

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (1); ETC.

4/23/2013: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES, WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE (1); ETC.

DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PL4INTIFF JONATHAN GHOBRIAL?S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM 1NTERROGATORIES - GENERAL AND EMPLOYMENT, MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQU

5/20/2013: DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PL4INTIFF JONATHAN GHOBRIAL?S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO FORM 1NTERROGATORIES - GENERAL AND EMPLOYMENT, MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO REQU

Minute Order -

7/11/2013: Minute Order -

STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TIME TO COMPLFE MEDIATION

10/16/2013: STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING TIME TO COMPLFE MEDIATION

STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

1/22/2014: STATEMENT OF AGREEMENT OR NONAGREEMENT

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS LIST FOR TRIAL

4/7/2014: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS LIST FOR TRIAL

DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF LODGMENT WITNESS LIST

4/7/2014: DEFENDANTS? NOTICE OF LODGMENT WITNESS LIST

PLAINTIFF?S CONFIDENTAIL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

4/8/2014: PLAINTIFF?S CONFIDENTAIL MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF

0 STIPULATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS

4/8/2014: 0 STIPULATION REGARDING SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS

Minute Order -

4/8/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/11/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order -

4/11/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

4/11/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Docketin Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • DocketNotice-Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 am in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (DEFENDANT'S MSC STATEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS ); Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other (PLAINTIFF'S CONFIDENTIAL MSC BRIEF ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketList of Witnesses; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • DocketList of Exhibits; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2014
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (WITNESS LIST ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketReply/Response; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DocketMotion to Compel (RESPONSES ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • DocketMotion; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REYES JORGE H.