This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 15:30:51 (UTC).

JOHN WHITE VS PABLO O GARCIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 JOHN WHITE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PABLO O GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0485

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WHITE JOHN

Defendants and Respondents

WOO LARRY

GARCIA PABLO O.

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HARTING SIMKINS & RYAN LLP

Defendant Attorney

JONES ROBYN N. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

5/19/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

11/10/2016: SUMMONS

DEMAND FOR JURY

5/19/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/10/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ANSWR TO COMPLAINT

5/19/2017: ANSWR TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/29/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Pablo O. Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Pablo O. Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Pablo O. Garcia (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • ANSWR TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by John White (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less