This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/02/2021 at 16:33:17 (UTC).

JOHN VARTANIAN MD VS MONICA BROWN

Case Summary

On 01/06/2014 JOHN VARTANIAN MD filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MONICA BROWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and FREDERICK C. SHALLER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2343

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

FREDERICK C. SHALLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VARTANIAN JOHN MD.

Defendants and Respondents

BROWN MONICA

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SINA LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DEFAMATION JURY TRIAL DEMAND

1/6/2014: COMPLAINT FOR DEFAMATION JURY TRIAL DEMAND

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 46; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 46; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 46; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketDECLARATION OF THOMAS ELFMONT RE DUE DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 46; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 46; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS DISQUALIFICATION MOTION [PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE C.C.P. 17O.6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John, MD. Vartanian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DEFAMATION JURY TRIAL DEMAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

P - O 00 N O W» AW N

A bOID

Reza Sina (SBN 250428) Goo™]

SINA LAW GROUP -

801 S. Figueroa Street, 12th Floor @6]0‘]‘-2\4'

Los Angeles, California 90017 FILEL 'Telephone (213) 417-3661 Y M (- S“P@f‘“’g%fios%%es l Facsimile: (877) 341-5578 | Email: reza(wsmalawgroup com ' H,fisfi JAN 06 7014

| Sherri R. (Zafie: Executive Ofiicer/Clerk Attorneys for Plaintiff, By Deputy

JOHN VARTANIAN, MD.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

(Central)

JOHN VARTANIAN, MD., * CASE NO.Plaintiff, |

COMPLAINT FOR DEFAMATION

MONICA BROWN; and Does 1-50, inclusive, , JURY TRIAL DEMAND

Defendants.

Plaintiff, based on information and belief, states as follows for his complaint:

NATURE OF THE ACTION | § T E A b= *u. m om -

1. Plaintiff JOHN VARTANIAN, MD (“Plamtlff«)r-br1ngs~:th1sf aotllorf;’;a(éamst Defendants Monica Brown and Does 1-50 (collectively, “Deferidanrs”) fogthe postmg of

false and defamatory reviews, messages and postings of Dr. Vartanian ovet;;the past fifteen

;..4. l:l.l oo ) months on Plaintiff’s professional Facebook profile at Facebook.com. k3 i