Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2021 at 11:23:56 (UTC).

JOHN RAY VS LU'S LIGHTHOUSE, INC., ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/21/2012 JOHN RAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LU'S LIGHTHOUSE, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROY L. PAUL, ROSS KLEIN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4362

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROY L. PAUL

ROSS KLEIN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAY JOHN

Claimant

SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LU'S LIGHTHOUSE INC.

STEVENSON VICTORIA

Not Classified By Court

SANDERS SALVADOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL R. CULLY & ASSOC.

Claimant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN J. FERBER

Defendant Attorneys

STEVEN D. LEVINE LAW OFFICES OF

TIVA AMICI-DAVANI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order -

8/12/2013: Minute Order -

ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

8/12/2013: ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY [INCLUDING DECLARATION OF NOTICE]

8/12/2013: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL; DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY [INCLUDING DECLARATION OF NOTICE]

ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

8/19/2013: ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEYS

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

9/3/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

9/3/2013: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

11/15/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (as to complaint ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S27; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Trial; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department Legacy; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2013
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED - LU'S LIGHTHOUSE, INC. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JOHN RAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JOHN RAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2012
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED - VICTORIA STEVENSON ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Filed by JOHN RAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2012
  • DocketNotice of Filing (THIRD PARTY ACTION. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by JOHN RAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOHN RAY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEABRIGHT INSURANCE CO is a litigant