This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 01:57:01 (UTC).

JOHN MURILLO VS MAURICE ALPHONSO BELL M.D. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/22/2016 JOHN MURILLO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MAURICE ALPHONSO BELL M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3547

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MURILLO JOHN

Defendants and Respondents

LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC.

BELL MAURICE ALPHONSO M.D.

DOES 1-100

MITAL RAJ ANAND M.D. DOE 1

LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SAROIAN ARA ESQ.

SAROIAN ARA

Defendant Attorneys

TANAKA KEVIN SEIJI

DUMMIT BUCHHOLZ & TRAPP

SCHMID & VOILES

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/9/2018: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/30/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT LAKE WOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S ANSWER

5/18/2018: DEFENDANT LAKE WOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S ANSWER

Minute Order

6/12/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CAMERON D. ARONSON, ESQ.,

6/12/2018: DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CAMERON D. ARONSON, ESQ.,

ORDER GRANTING DEFENANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

6/12/2018: ORDER GRANTING DEFENANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT LAKE WOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

6/12/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEFENDANT LAKE WOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

DECLARATION OF CAMERON D. ARONSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF JOHN MURILLOS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET

10/3/2018: DECLARATION OF CAMERON D. ARONSON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF JOHN MURILLOS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES SET

DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTWF JOHN MURILLO'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL LNTERROGATORIES SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE

10/3/2018: DEFENDANT LAKEWOOD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTWF JOHN MURILLO'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL LNTERROGATORIES SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE

Declaration

10/18/2018: Declaration

Order

11/15/2018: Order

Minute Order

11/15/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

11/16/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/28/2019: Minute Order

Complaint

12/22/2016: Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/11/2017: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/11/2017: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Unknown

9/7/2017: Unknown

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Lakewood Regional Medical Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order to continue the trial date) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order to continue the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date); Filed by Lakewood Regional Medical Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice of Ruling (on Motion to Compel Discovery); Filed by Lakewood Regional Medical Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's Request for Production (Set Two) and Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $985.00) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by John Murillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by John Murillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint; Filed by John Murillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by John Murillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Summons; Filed by John Murillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC643547    Hearing Date: December 18, 2019    Dept: 2

Murillo v. Bell, et al.

Two (2) Motions by Defendant, Lakewood Regional Medical Center, to Compel Plaintiff’s Counsel and Plaintiff’s Counsel’s Assistant, Marlene Rangel, to Appear for Deposition; Request for Sanctions are DENIED without prejudice.

Plaintiff’s counsel, Mr. Saroian, provides copies of the proofs of service of the subpoenas on Mr. Saroian and Ms. Rangel, respectively. Neither are signed and dated nor do they reflect when and at what time the witnesses were personally served. Decl of Saroian, Ex. B.

Because there is no proof that the subpoenas were properly served, the Court denies the motion without prejudice.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC643547    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 2

BC643547 Murillo v. Bell, M.D., et al. 

The court withdraws its previously posted tentative transferring the case to an Independent Calendar Court. Instead, the court continues the hearing on the Motion to Compel Plaintiff’s Counsel to Appear for Deposition and Motion to Compel Plaintiff’s Counsel’s Assistant to Appear for Deposition. The new hearing date is 12/18/19 at 1:30 p.m. at Department SS-2.