This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 00:02:35 (UTC).

JOHN MELLESMOEN VS TINDER, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2016 JOHN MELLESMOEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TINDER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6284

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELLESMOEN JOHN

Defendants

TINDER INC.

RAD SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LUSKIN SCOTT O.

LAND SHANNON A.

Defendant Attorney

MANATT PHELPS PHILLIPS

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

5/30/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/31/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/31/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

5/31/2019: Unknown

Notice of Ruling

5/31/2019: Notice of Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( FOR TRL CONT) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 2:39 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR TRL CONT)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/31/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by John Mellesmoen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (JT EXPARTE APP FOR TRL CONT); Filed by Tinder, Inc. (Defendant); Sean Rad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department N; Ex-Parte Proceedings - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEN, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Exparte proceeding - Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2016
  • Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT; MEMO OF P&A ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Demurrer; Filed by Tinder, Inc. (Defendant); Sean Rad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Motion to Strike; Filed by Tinder, Inc. (Defendant); Sean Rad (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF PLFS COMPLAINT; MEMO OF P&A ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by John Mellesmoen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by John Mellesmoen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC126284    Hearing Date: November 18, 2020    Dept: N

TENTATIVE RULING

Defendant Tinder, Inc.’s

Defendant Sean Rad’s Motion to File Records Under Seal is GRANTED.

Moving parties to give notice.

REASONING

The trial court “may order that a record be filed under seal only if it expressly finds facts that establish: (1) There exists an overriding interest that overcomes the right of public access to the record; (2) The overriding interest supports sealing the record; (3) A substantial probability exists that the overriding interest will be prejudiced if the record is not sealed; (4) The proposed sealing is narrowly tailored; and (5) No less restrictive means exist to achieve the overriding interest.” (McGuan v. Endovascular Techs., Inc. (2010) 182 Cal.App.4th 974, 988, paragraph breaks omitted.)

Here, Defendants Tinder, Inc., and Sean Rad (“Defendants”) move to seal certain confidential documents supporting their respective motions for summary judgment. Defendants represent the exhibits contain confidential and private information with regard to trade secret or competitively sensitive business, commercial and financial information. Specifically, Defendants move to seal Exhibits 1 through 5 to the Declaration of Jonathan Badeen, Exhibits 1 through 13 to the Declaration of Brian Norgard, Exhibits 1 through 15 to the Declaration of Sean Rad, and Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Ryan Ogle. 

Defendants contend the information is subject to the right to privacy and certain protections from public disclosure, and none of the information has any significance to the public. Further, Defendants argue the information is relevant to past and future product development, a substantial probability exists that their interests will be prejudiced if the information is not sealed and there is no less restrictive means to achieve the overriding interest. 

The Court finds an order sealing the identified documents is proper. An overriding interest exists here that overcomes the right of public access to the records, i.e., Defendants’ right to maintaining the confidentiality of their proprietary information, and the public has no interest in accessing such information. The request is also narrowly tailored, in that Defendants ask only to seal such information that would disclose confidential information, and thus, the Court concludes it is proper to seal these records from public disclosure. 

For these reasons, Defendant Tinder, Inc.’s

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tinder, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUSKIN SCOTT OLIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lang, Shannon A