Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2019 at 05:01:37 (UTC).

JOHN LEVIN,M.D. VS. JOHN GORDON JONES

Case Summary

On 06/01/2009 JOHN LEVIN,M D filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN GORDON JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ and NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3353

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LINDA K. LEFKOWITZ

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEVIN M.D. JOHN

IEZZA NICK I.

Defendants

GORDON ELI ALLEN

KIMBALL TIREY & ST.JOHN

JONES JOHN GORDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN L. DOUGLAS

SPIWAK & IEZZA

IEZZA NICK I.

Defendant Attorneys

KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN

ROTHMAN BARRY

Other Attorneys

BARRY ROTHMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • at 09:00 AM in Department P; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrg; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • at 09:00 am in Department WEP, Nancy L. Newman, Presiding; Judgment Debtor Examination Hrg (AS TO JOHN GORDON JONES) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Notice of Stay (OF PROCEEDINGS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by M.D., JOHN LEVIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Application - Miscellaneous (AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Application ; Filed by M.D., JOHN LEVIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Writ-Other (RETURN ON WRIT OF EXECUTION BY SHERIFF WAS FILED ON 09/14/17. UNSATISFIED. ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued (ABSTRACT ISSUED AND MAILED IN SASE ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2009
  • Answer; Filed by JOHN GORDON JONES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • Answer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by JOHN GORDON JONES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • Summons; Filed by JOHN GORDON JONES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2009
  • Cross-complaint filed; Filed by Attorney for Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by M.D., JOHN LEVIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2009
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Complaint; Filed by M.D., JOHN LEVIN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC103353    Hearing Date: February 03, 2021    Dept: P

Tentative Ruling

Levin v. Jones et al., Case No. SC103353

Hearing Date February 3, 2021

Plaintiff’s Motion to Modify Judgment (UNOPPOSED)

In 2010 plaintiff prevailed via summary judgment against defendant and obtained a judgment of $446,027.40 plus interest. In 2018 defendant filed for chapter 7 bankruptcy, seeking to discharge the judgment. Plaintiff filed an adversary proceeding in the bankruptcy court, attempting to prevent discharge. In September 2020 the parties settled the adversary proceeding, and the bankruptcy court approved the compromise. Plaintiff moves to amend the judgment to reflect the terms of the bankruptcy settlement.

A court may amend a judgment under the authority to use “all the means necessary to carry [its jurisdiction] into effect” granted under Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. §187. “The greatest liberality is to be encouraged” in allowing amendments under §187. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Weinbert (2014) 227 Cal.App.4th 1, 7.

Pursuant to the bankruptcy settlement, judgment was reduced to $100,000 and deemed non-dischargeable. Exh. 1. The bankruptcy court approved the settlement, and defendant does not oppose the requested amendment. The court will amend the judgment. GRANTED. Plaintiff is to prepare and file an amended judgment vie eCourt.

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC, PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO APPEAR VIA LA COURT CONNECT.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIMBALL TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROTHMAN, BARRY