This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/30/2020 at 04:41:21 (UTC).

JOHN HOLDEN, ET AL VS. ELIGIO FRANCO

Case Summary

On 04/11/2012 JOHN HOLDEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELIGIO FRANCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO, RAMONA G. SEE and DUDLEY W. GRAY II. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6883

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

RAMONA G. SEE

DUDLEY W. GRAY II

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOLDEN CAROLE

HOLDEN JOHN

Defendants

DOES 1-20

FRANCO ELIGIO

FRANCO JAVIER DOE 1

Not Classified By Court

NEES WILLIAM E. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMADOR KELLY LLP

Defendant Attorney

CLASEN RAFFALOW & RHOADS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/11/2012: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons

4/11/2012: Summons

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/14/2012: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-08-14 00:00:00

8/14/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-08-14 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEMURRER

9/4/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEMURRER

Case Management Statement

9/12/2012: Case Management Statement

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL(NOT ENTIRE CASE)

10/9/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL(NOT ENTIRE CASE)

Notice of Ruling

10/19/2012: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

11/15/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MISCELLANEOUS-OTHER

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

11/29/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION DOCUMENT FILED

11/29/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OBJECTION DOCUMENT FILED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY TO OPPOSITION

12/6/2012: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REPLY TO OPPOSITION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-12-12 00:00:00

12/12/2012: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2012-12-12 00:00:00

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/14/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/11/2013: Other - - CIVIL DEPOSIT

Other - - NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

3/22/2013: Other - - NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR) HEARING

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/2/2013: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

NOTICE OF SETFLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/10/2013: NOTICE OF SETFLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; (Osc Re Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-06-11 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JOHN HOLDEN (Plaintiff); CAROLE HOLDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (entire action w/prej ); Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA91, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Jury Trial (NTC OF SETTLEMENT FILED 9-10-13) - Hearing Previously Adv. and Vac.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2013
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2013-09-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 91; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA91, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding; Final Status Conference (TRIAL DATE: 9/24/13MED. COMPL. DATE: 8/16/138-16-13) - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2012-06-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JOHN HOLDEN (Plaintiff); CAROLE HOLDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JOHN HOLDEN (Plaintiff); CAROLE HOLDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by JOHN HOLDEN (Plaintiff); CAROLE HOLDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • DocketSummons; Filed by JOHN HOLDEN (Plaintiff); CAROLE HOLDEN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less