This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2021 at 01:09:26 (UTC).

JOHN C DAVIES ET AL VS AMCORD INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2013 JOHN C DAVIES filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMCORD INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1140

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIES ELLEN J.

DAVIES JOHN C.

Defendants and Respondents

AKZO NOBEL PAINTS LLC

AMCORD INC.

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC.

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

DAP INC.

DORSETT & JACKSON INC.

ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS INC.

GLIDDEN COMPANY THE

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT INC.

HIGHLAND STUCCO AND LIME PRODUCTS INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

INGERSOLL RAND COMPANY

KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY INC.

MERLEX STUCCO INC.

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

HAWKINS PARNELL THACKSTON & YOUNG LLP

MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LAW O/O

SELMAN & BREITMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/28/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

1/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

7/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/16/2019

SUMMONS -

12/20/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

12/20/2013: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - DORSETT & JACKSON, INC.

3/18/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - DORSETT & JACKSON, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - MERLEX STUCCO, INC.

6/23/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - MERLEX STUCCO, INC.

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL

9/11/2014: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL

JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL

9/11/2014: JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS, INC.

9/26/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - ELEMENTIS CHEMICALS, INC.

PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CASE REPORT

10/1/2014: PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED CASE REPORT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO INTERVENORS'' COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION; (SEE ATTACHMENT)

10/17/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - AS TO INTERVENORS'' COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION; (SEE ATTACHMENT)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - RICH-TEX, INC.

10/17/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - RICH-TEX, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - TRANE US, INC.

10/20/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - TRANE US, INC.

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/16/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal: BC531140-

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Bankruptcy: BC531140-NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL PAREX USA, INC.; REJECTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL DORSETT & JACKSON, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • DocketNtc of Unpaid Filing Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by John C. Davies (Plaintiff); Ellen J. Davies (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2013
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less