This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 23:02:27 (UTC).

JOHN BUTTS VS RONALD DAVID PERLSTEIN

Case Summary

On 06/25/2015 JOHN BUTTS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RONALD DAVID PERLSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER and ROGER ITO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4870

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

ROGER ITO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUTTS JOHN

LIBERATOR BARBARA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DANCO INC A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN

PERLSTEIN RONALD DAVID AN INDIVIDUAL

PERLSTEIN RONALD

DANCO INC.A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Defendants

GRAVES JACKIE AN INDIVIDUAL

CHANGEMYRATE.COM A NEVADA CORPORATION

GRAVES JACKIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLFF DAVID LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

YOURIST LAW CORPORATION APC

Cross Defendant Attorney

MENDLOVITZ SIDNEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2017
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (TD=02/15/17) - Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by JOHN BUTTS (Plaintiff); BARBARA LIBERATOR (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice (DISMISSING COMPLAINT OF JOHN BUTTS AND BARBARA LIBERATOR ONLY ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice (OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DANCO, INC. & RONALD PERLSTEIN ON 3/8/16 ); Filed by Atty for Defendant and Cross-Compl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketPartial Dismissal With Prejudice; Filed by RONALD PERLSTEIN (Legacy Party); DANCO, INC A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by RONALD PERLSTEIN (Legacy Party); DANCO, INC A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketRequest for Correction; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by RONALD PERLSTEIN (Legacy Party); DANCO, INC A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by RONALD PERLSTEIN (Legacy Party); DANCO, INC A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less