This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 01:43:32 (UTC).

JOHN B. CLARK JR., VS SEA COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 10/08/2015 JOHN B CLARK JR filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against SEA COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STUART M. RICE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0880

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARK JR. JOHN B.

Defendants

MCCAUL PAUL F.

MCCAUL THERESA A.

PERRY ROBERT X.

SEA COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

MCCAUL TERRI A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMART LAW APLC

CAMPBELL NICK M.

NICK M. CAMPBELL

Defendant Attorneys

ADAMS & AUCOIN LLP

JOSEPH R. SERPICO ESQ.

KULIK GOTTESMAN & MOUTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2017
  • Request for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHN B. CLARK, JR. ON 10/8/15 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by JR., JOHN B. CLARK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department B; (OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg.; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • at 01:30 pm in Department B, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; OSC-Failure to File Dism. or Judg. (**CASE IS SETTLED**) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; (Further Proceedings; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • at 08:30 am in Department B, Stuart M. Rice, Presiding; Further Proceedings (**CASE IS STAYED**----------------------------------RELATED TO YC071741 & YC068918) - Case Deemed Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by JR., JOHN B. CLARK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by SEA COURT HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, (Defendant); PAUL F. MCCAUL (Defendant); THERESA A. MCCAUL (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 10/08/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Miscellaneous-Other (CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL CODE SECTION 5950 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Notice (NOTICE OF RELATED CASE YC068918 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by JR., JOHN B. CLARK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by JR., JOHN B. CLARK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2012
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.