Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 07:49:56 (UTC).

JOHN ANTHONY CORO JR VS BAIR'S KEYSTONE BODY SHOP INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2015 JOHN ANTHONY CORO JR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BAIR'S KEYSTONE BODY SHOP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD and HOWARD L. HALM. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6005

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

STEVEN J. KLEIFIELD

HOWARD L. HALM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CORO JOHN ANTHONY JR.

Defendants and Respondents

BAIR'S KEYSTONE BODY SHOP INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

SMILOVE MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAVI & EBRAHIMIAN LLP

EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MADONI STEPHEN A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

8/1/2017: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RELIEF FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOVERNMENT CODE ? 12940(A) OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT (?FEHA?): DISPARATE TREATMENT BASED ON DISABILITY A

3/19/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RELIEF FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOVERNMENT CODE ? 12940(A) OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT (?FEHA?): DISPARATE TREATMENT BASED ON DISABILITY A

SUMMONS

3/19/2015: SUMMONS

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

5/27/2015: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SMILOVE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF MARVIN CORO

5/25/2016: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SMILOVE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF MARVIN CORO

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING

6/10/2016: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RULING

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOHN ANTHONY CORO, JR.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES

6/22/2016: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF JOHN ANTHONY CORO, JR.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DATES

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SMILOVE EN OPPOSTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF FRANCISCO RAMIREZ AND YUAN ALBERTO ANDINO

7/27/2016: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL SMILOVE EN OPPOSTION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF FRANCISCO RAMIREZ AND YUAN ALBERTO ANDINO

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

7/29/2016: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

8/5/2016: DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

Minute Order

8/11/2016: Minute Order

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

10/11/2016: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/2/2016: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER TWO TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

11/18/2016: DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NUMBER TWO TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO EMOTIONAL DISTRESS

JOINT [PROPOSED] TRIAL WITNESS LIST

11/21/2016: JOINT [PROPOSED] TRIAL WITNESS LIST

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO MICHAEL SMILOVE'S FELONY CONVICTION

12/2/2016: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE RELATED TO MICHAEL SMILOVE'S FELONY CONVICTION

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT BAIR'S KEYSTONIE BODY SHOP, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $42,500.00 PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 AND REQUE

3/7/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT BAIR'S KEYSTONIE BODY SHOP, INC. IN THE AMOUNT OF $42,500.00 PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 AND REQUE

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT BAIR'S KEYSTONE BODY SHOP, INC. AND MICHAEL SMILOVE IN THE AMOUNT OF $42,500.OO PURSUA

4/4/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT BAIR'S KEYSTONE BODY SHOP, INC. AND MICHAEL SMILOVE IN THE AMOUNT OF $42,500.OO PURSUA

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • Writ-Other Issued; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • at 08:29 AM in Department 53; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DEPARTMENT 53 LAW AND MOTION RULINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
213 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT BAIR'S KEYSTONE BODY SHOP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by John Anthony Jr. Coro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2015
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RELIEF FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOVERNMENT CODE 12940(A) OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT ("FEHA"): DISPARATE TREATMENT BASED ON DISABILITY AND/OR PERCEIVED DISABILITY; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2015
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by John Anthony Jr. Coro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND RELIEF FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOVERNMENT CODE 12940(A) OF THE FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT (FEHA): DISPARATE TREATMENT BASED ON DISABILITY AND/OR PERCEIVED DISABILITY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/1966
  • at 11:00 AM in Department 53; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC576005    Hearing Date: February 19, 2021    Dept: 53

Coro v. Bair’s Keystone Body Shop, Inc., BC576005

On February 19, 2021, Michael Smilove presented to the court an Ex Parte Application for an Order Vacating the January 6, 2021 Order for: 1. Appearance and Examination, and 2. Issuance of Bench Warrant (“Ex Parte Application”).

On January 6, 2021, the court issued a minute order which continued the hearing on the Order for Appearance and Examination directed to Michael Smilove, President of Bair’s Keystone Body Shop, Inc., to March 4, 2021, at 8:30 a.m., in Department 53. In that minute order, the court also (1) issued a bench warrant for Michael Smilove, President of Bair’s Keystone Body Shop, Inc., (2) set bail in the amount of $5,000 on the bench warrant, and (3) ordered that the bench warrant is held until the continued hearing on the Order for Appearance and Examination. Thus, at this time, the bench warrant issued on January 6, 2021, is being held and has not been released.

The court finds that Michael Smilove has not satisfied the requirement of California Rules of Court, rule 3.1202, subdivision (c), that an applicant for an ex parte order must make an affirmative factual showing in a declaration containing competent testimony based on personal knowledge of irreparable harm, immediate danger, or other statutory basis for granting relief ex parte. The court therefore denies the Ex Parte Application without prejudice to Michael Smilove’s filing a motion seeking the relief sought in the Ex Parte Application on regular notice.

If Michael Smilove files a regularly-noticed motion seeking the relief sought in the Ex Parte Application, he or his counsel may appear at the March 4, 2021 hearing on the Order for Appearance and Examination and request that the court continue the hearing and continue to hold the bench warrant issued on January 6, 2021, until the date on which Michael Smilove’s regularly-noticed motion seeking relief is set for hearing. Michael Smilove or his counsel may appear at the hearing remotely by LACourtConnect.

The court orders judgment creditor’s counsel and Michael Smilove’s counsel to meet and confer no later than February 26, 2021, to make a reasonable and good faith effort to resolve the issues presented in Michael Smilove’s Ex Parte Application.

The court orders Michael Smilove to give notice of this order.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MADONI STEPHEN A.