This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 13:32:26 (UTC).

JOHN FAIRBANKS VS KLAUS BADELT

Case Summary

On 04/23/2015 JOHN FAIRBANKS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KLAUS BADELT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LISA HART COLE, MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF, LAWRENCE CHO and BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4076

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LISA HART COLE

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

LAWRENCE CHO

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FAIRBANKS JOHN

RJC BUILDERS INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BADELT KLAUS

RJC BUILDERS INC.

DB PRIVATE WEALTH MORTGAGE LTD

THE LAW OFFICES OF GORDON L. POLON CONSULTING ENGINEERS

POLON GORDON L.

TRUST OF JOHN S. FAIRBANKS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MURPHY M. LAURIE

LORMAN BRUCE M.

MURPHY M LAURIE

Defendant Attorneys

BREMER WHYTE BROWN & O'MEARA

TELANOFF ADAM JORDAN

O'MEARA JOHN VINCENT

TELANOFF ADAM J.

NAU KELSEY CHARMAINE

COLLINS COLLINS MUIR & STEWART LLP

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document

4/20/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/20/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

3/14/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/27/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

6/20/2016: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/1/2016: Legacy Document

Motion in Limine

4/5/2018: Motion in Limine

General Denial

5/9/2016: General Denial

Notice of Ruling

3/22/2018: Notice of Ruling

Legacy Document

4/20/2018: Legacy Document

Answer

6/12/2017: Answer

Legacy Document

4/20/2018: Legacy Document

Opposition

4/17/2018: Opposition

Motion in Limine

4/5/2018: Motion in Limine

Summons

5/9/2016: Summons

Minute Order

2/5/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

4/22/2016: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

6/2/2017: Minute Order

103 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by John Fairbanks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • at 09:15 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Court Order (Re Defendatnt Klaus Badelt's Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 170.6 against Judge H. Jay Ford III) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Defendatnt Klaus Badelt's Peremptory Challenge...) of 11/29/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order ((Court Order Re Defendatnt Klaus Badelt's Peremptory Challenge...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Klaus Badelt (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
238 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2015
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEO, Lisa Hart Cole, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-08-10 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Minute Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Statement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by John Fairbanks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by John Fairbanks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.