This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/18/2020 at 12:01:34 (UTC).

JOEL SCHUYLER VS MORTONS OF CHICAGO INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2010 JOEL SCHUYLER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MORTONS OF CHICAGO INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS and MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3233

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

MICHELLE R. ROSENBLATT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHUYLER JOEL

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 100

MORTON'S OF CHICAGO INC.

MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE

STEAKHOUSE MORTON'S THE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOLDSTEIN MICHAEL B. ESQ.

ANTONELLI JOSEPH ESQ.

BARNES KEVIN T. ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

DEBORAH C. SAXE

SAXE DEBORAH C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2010
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Morton's of Chicago, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • DocketNOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA- WESTERN DIVISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketANSWER TO CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Morton's of Chicago, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Joel Schuyler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 324; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • DocketPROOF 01 SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Joel Schuyler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Joel Schuyler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY OVERTIME WAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joel Schuyler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTON'S THE STEAKHOUSE is a litigant