This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 00:16:55 (UTC).

JOEL ROBINSON VS CENTURY EVALUATION MEDICAL SERVICES INC ET

Case Summary

On 02/11/2016 JOEL ROBINSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CENTURY EVALUATION MEDICAL SERVICES INC ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0406

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBINSON JOEL

Defendants and Respondents

LOGISTIC CARE SOLUTIONS LLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 15

CENTURY EVALUATION MEDICAL SERVICES INC.

D. JAMES DONALDSON & CENTURY MEDICAL

JARMARE DAVIS DOE2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

ZELNER & KARPEL

KARPEL DONALD E. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SHIMKIN DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/18/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

8/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/7/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

1/14/2019: Unknown

SUMMONS

2/11/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/7/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

5/18/2016: Minute Order

LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) IMPLIED INDEMNITY (2) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY (3) CONTRIBUTION (4) EXPRESS INDEMNITY (5) BREACH OF CONTRACT

7/5/2016: LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR: (1) IMPLIED INDEMNITY (2) EQUITABLE INDEMNITY (3) CONTRIBUTION (4) EXPRESS INDEMNITY (5) BREACH OF CONTRACT

DECLARATION OF BRETT N. TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDIJM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/5/2016: DECLARATION OF BRETT N. TAYLOR IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S DEMURRER; MEMORANDIJM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/12/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order

9/7/2016: Minute Order

LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/26/2016: LOGISTICARE SOLUTIONS, LLC'S ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/30/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

3/15/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE

4/19/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

7/17/2017: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

8/28/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

11/13/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why This Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure of Plaintiff to Enter Default Judgment as to Defendants Century Evaluation Medical Services, Inc., James Donaldson-dba- Century Medical Services (Doe 1), and Jarmare Davis, (Doe 2) Per CRC 3.110(h)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why This Action Should Not Be Dismiss...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to any remaining Defendants - including Does) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure of Plaintiff to Enter Default Judgment as to Defendants Century Evaluation Medical Services, Inc., James Donaldson-dba- Century Medical Services (Doe 1), and Jarmare Davis, (Doe 2)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 3:34 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re Denying Default Judgment;) of 01/14/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Minute Order ((Court Order Re Denying Default Judgment;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Order (By the Court denying Request For Default Judgment without Prejudice); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Notice (of Continued Order to Show Cause re Default Judgment); Filed by Joel Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
120 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Joel Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Joel Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Joel Robinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR MONEY DAMAGES (PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC610406    Hearing Date: January 07, 2020    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JOEL ROBINSON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CENTURY MEDICAL SERVICES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC610406

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

January 7, 2020

Plaintiff, Joel Robinson filed this action against Defendants, Century Medical Services and Logisticare Solutions, LLC for damages arising out of an automobile accident.  Plaintiff filed his original complaint on 2/11/16.  Plaintiff filed his operative First Amended Complaint on 8/24/16.  The FAC includes the two original defendants and also names Century Evaluation Medical services, Inc. as a third named defendant.  Plaintiff dismissed all claims against Logisticare on 9/14/17.

On 11/16/16, Plaintiff named D. James Donaldson, individually and dba Century Medical Services as Doe 1.  On 6/22/17, Plaintiff named Jarmare Davis as Doe 2.  Donaldson and Davis are both in default.

On 9/18/19, in connection with a request for default judgment, Plaintiff filed a request for dismissal of does 1-100.  The clerk’s office processed the dismissal the same day.  The Court denied Plaintiff’s request for default judgment without prejudice, noting, “Plaintiff must have the dismissal of Does 1 and 2 vacated if he wishes to obtain a default judgment against Donaldson and/or Davis.” 

At this time, Plaintiff moves to vacate the dismissal of Does 1 and 2, noting that the request for dismissal should have been as to Does 3-100, and the dismissal of Does 1 and 2 was the result of attorney error.  The motion to vacate the dismissal is granted.  CCP §473(b).  Plaintiff may proceed to seek default judgment against Donaldson and/or Davis.  Plaintiff must file a new request for dismissal of Does 3-100 in connection with any default judgment package. 

No notice is necessary, as no other party remains active in this action. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.