This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:17:00 (UTC).

JODI ROSENBLATT VS BRAD PENENBERG M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 JODI ROSENBLATT filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against BRAD PENENBERG M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2026

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROSENBLATT JODI

Defendants and Respondents

PENENBERG BRAD M.D.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

ARTHRISTIS AND JOINT RECONSTRUCTION INS-

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF ZELNER & KARPEL

Defendant Attorney

AMES DENNIS K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

V NOTICE OF RULING ON ? DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERC M.D.S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/16/2018: V NOTICE OF RULING ON ? DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERC M.D.S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

3/16/2018: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order

3/16/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/27/2018: Minute Order

ORDER ON DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERG, M.D.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE SEPTEMBER 11,2018 TRIAL DATE

7/27/2018: ORDER ON DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERG, M.D.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE SEPTEMBER 11,2018 TRIAL DATE

Notice

10/31/2018: Notice

Minute Order

4/24/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

2/26/2016: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FROM MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

2/26/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FROM MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/29/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

STIPULATION TO WAIVE EFFECTS OF GARIBAY V. HEMMAT

4/24/2017: STIPULATION TO WAIVE EFFECTS OF GARIBAY V. HEMMAT

DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERG, M.D.'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.

4/24/2017: DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERG, M.D.'S, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC.

NOTICE OF RULING

7/6/2017: NOTICE OF RULING

Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

8/4/2017: Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail

OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/4/2017: OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERG, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/9/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERG, M.D.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order

11/29/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBER M.D.'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION DR. RAJAGOPALAN, M.D. BROUGHT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1987.1(A)

12/7/2017: DEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBER M.D.'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING THE DEPOSITION DR. RAJAGOPALAN, M.D. BROUGHT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1987.1(A)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for Continuance of Trial and Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial and ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (for Continuance of Trial and Related Dates); Filed by Jodi Rosenblatt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; (OSC RE Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2016
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Brad, M.D. Penenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Brad, M.D. Penenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Brad, M.D. Penenberg (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANT, BRAD L. PENENBERG, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jodi Rosenblatt (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FROM MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC612026    Hearing Date: November 19, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

jodi rosenblatt,

Plaintiff,

v.

brad penenberg, m.d., et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC612026

Hearing Date: November 19, 2019

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Donald E. Karpel, Esq. (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Jodi Rosenblatt (“Plaintiff”). The motion is granted.

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is a breakdown in the attorney-client relationship. That is a valid basis for withdrawal. Accordingly, the motion is granted.

Counsel should note that the order will become effective upon the filing of proof of service of a signed copy of the orders on Plaintiff. Counsel will remain the attorney of record until Counsel files with the court proof of service of the signed order. Counsel must serve a copy of the signed order (form MC-053) on Plaintiff within 10 days, and file proof of service thereof.

DATED: November 19, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court