This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2019 at 12:10:26 (UTC).

JOANNA MONTELONGO VS ST MARY MEDICAL CENTER ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 JOANNA MONTELONGO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST MARY MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EMILIE H. ELIAS, DANIEL S. MURPHY and BENNY C. OSORIO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3696

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EMILIE H. ELIAS

DANIEL S. MURPHY

BENNY C. OSORIO

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

COWAN LINDA M.D.

DOES 1 TO 50

EISNER PEDIATRIC & FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER

LINDA S. COWAN M.D. A PROFESSIONAL COR-

REPRODUCTIVE ASSOCIATES MEDICAL GROUP

SOHL BERTRAM E. M.D.

ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER

Minor

MONTELONGO JOANNA

Guardian Ad Litem

MONTELONGO JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TAGGART DEBORAH S.

BELSKY & ASSOCIATES

CARROLL RICHARD D. ESQ.

Minor Attorney

MCMAHAN LAW PC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

9/18/2015: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

SUMMONS

9/22/2015: SUMMONS

Minute Order

10/19/2015: Minute Order

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/17/2015: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY COURTCALL

1/15/2016: NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY COURTCALL

Minute Order

1/19/2016: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

1/20/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/23/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, OR WRONGFUL DEATH

3/10/2016: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, OR WRONGFUL DEATH

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/29/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

8/29/2016: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC

8/29/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ETC

TABLE OF CONTENTS OF EVIDENCE AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/29/2016: TABLE OF CONTENTS OF EVIDENCE AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING TABLE OF CONTENTS OF EVIDENCE AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/30/2016: NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING TABLE OF CONTENTS OF EVIDENCE AND EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

10/14/2016: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

ORDER RE: MOTION BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

11/8/2016: ORDER RE: MOTION BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/30/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

2/27/2017: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 97; (Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 97; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Motion for Summary Judgment; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Linda, M.D. Cowan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Jose Montelongo (Legacy Party); Joanna Montelongo (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2015
  • at 00:00 AM in Department 324; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be non-Complex) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • in Department 324, Emilie H. Elias, Presiding; Order-Complex Determination - Case Determined to be non-Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (FOR JOANNA MONTELONGO ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Application-Miscellaneous (FOR JOANNA MONTELONGO GUARDIAN AD LITEM ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EISNER PEDIATRIC & FAMILY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAGGART DEBORAH S. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARROLL RICHARD D. ESQ.