This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 13:25:53 (UTC).

JOANN CULLIGAN VS LAUGH FACTORY INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/02/2015 JOANN CULLIGAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAUGH FACTORY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7703

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CULLIGAN JOANN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS INC.

LAUGH FACTORY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JENNIE LEVIN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

10/21/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

4/2/2015: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/2/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; (OSC RE Dismissal; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 97; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 97; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Joann Culligan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Joann Culligan (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOX TELEVISION STUDIOS INCORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LAUGH FACTORY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant