This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/27/2021 at 20:19:23 (UTC).

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE VS THE LOS ANGELE

Case Summary

On 10/15/2013 JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVICE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE LOS ANGELE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4434

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JMS AIR CONDITIONING AND APPLIANCE SERVIC

JMS A/C & HEATING

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SCHULLER HENRI R. ESQ

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

10/15/2013: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; AND 2. SERVICES RENDERED

10/15/2013: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; AND 2. SERVICES RENDERED

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/1/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

1/15/2014: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

1/28/2014: Minute Order -

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 47, Debre K. Weintraub, Presiding; Conference-Case Management - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (COMPLAINT-ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2013
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JMS A/C & HEATING is a litigant

Latest cases where JMS AIR CONDITIONING & APPLIANCE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHULLER HENRI R. ESQ