Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2019 at 21:32:20 (UTC).

JIUZHOU JENA CO LTD VS YUE CHUNG LO ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2016 JIUZHOU JENA CO LTD filed an Other lawsuit against YUE CHUNG LO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8881

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JIUZHOU JENA CO. LTD

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

YUE CHUNG LO

INFINITE DIGITAL INC.

M. BROTHERS INC.

LO RODNEY

LO YUE CHUNG AKA RODNEY LO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF JAMES TAM

TAM AVERY

DEWITT CLYDE F.

PETERS GERALD PHILIP

Defendant Attorneys

APPLEBAUM SANDRA J.

COCO SALVATORE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT YUE CHUNG LO, AKA RODNEY LO, TO SERVE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES [SET ONE]

1/12/2018: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISCOVERY RESPONSES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT YUE CHUNG LO, AKA RODNEY LO, TO SERVE FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES [SET ONE]

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANNTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

1/12/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANNTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

PLAINTIFF JIUZHOU JENA CO. LTD.?S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CAUSES OF ACTION, AS TO DEFENDANT M. BROTHERS, INC.

1/19/2018: PLAINTIFF JIUZHOU JENA CO. LTD.?S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF CAUSES OF ACTION, AS TO DEFENDANT M. BROTHERS, INC.

DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE DOCUMENTS FILED: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; ETC.

4/18/2018: DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE DOCUMENTS FILED: DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; ETC.

Minute Order

5/2/2018: Minute Order

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AVERY TAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JIUZHOU JENA'S NOTICES OF MOTION AND MOTIONS TO (1) COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS SET 2 FROM DEFENDANT M. BROTHERS,

8/23/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AVERY TAM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF JIUZHOU JENA'S NOTICES OF MOTION AND MOTIONS TO (1) COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS SET 2 FROM DEFENDANT M. BROTHERS,

DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ISSUES RE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) PROPOUNDED ON PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANT M. BROTHERS, INC.

9/14/2018: DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF ISSUES RE MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO) PROPOUNDED ON PLAINTIFF BY DEFENDANT M. BROTHERS, INC.

DEFENDANTS' INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

10/1/2018: DEFENDANTS' INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SANDRA J. APPLEBAUM OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S OSC FOR CONTEMPT AND SANCTIONS

10/2/2018: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF SANDRA J. APPLEBAUM OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S OSC FOR CONTEMPT AND SANCTIONS

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

10/11/2018: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter

Minute Order

2/1/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Lodging

4/5/2019: Notice of Lodging

Unknown

5/30/2019: Unknown

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS [CCP ?4 15.50]; AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF CONCURRENTLY FILED DOCUMENTS: 1. DEC1ARATON OF AVERY TAM 2. DECLARATION OF HUANG

10/21/2016: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS [CCP ?4 15.50]; AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF CONCURRENTLY FILED DOCUMENTS: 1. DEC1ARATON OF AVERY TAM 2. DECLARATION OF HUANG

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/2/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

5/25/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/25/2017: Minute Order

Proof of Service

10/19/2017: Proof of Service

271 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by M. Brothers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 73; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: All Trial Issues)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Statement of Decision (Tentative) Re All Trial Issues]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Statement of Decision ((Tentative) Re All Trial Issues); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: All Trial Issues) of 05/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Submission of Brief) - Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Brief (Respondent's Reply Closing Brief); Filed by Yue Chung Lo (Defendant); Infinite Digital, Inc. (Defendant); M. Brothers, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Brief)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Reply (PLAINTIFF JIUZHOU JENA CO., LTD'S POST-TRIAL REPLY BRIEF; DECLARATION OF A VERY TAM); Filed by Jiuzhou Jena Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
541 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2016
  • Minute order entered: 2016-08-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Summons; Filed by Jiuzhou Jena Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Jiuzhou Jena Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jiuzhou Jena Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. ACCOUNT STATED

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC618881    Hearing Date: November 10, 2020    Dept: 73

11/10/20 Dept. 73 Rafael Ongkeko, Judge presiding JIUZHOU JENA, etc. vs. YUE CHUNG LO, etc. (BC618881)

Counsel for plaintiff/moving party Jiuzhou Jena Co., Ltd.: Avery Tam, et al.

Counsel for defendants/moving party M. Brothers, Inc.: Sandra Applebaum; Salvatore Coco

Plaintiff’s motion to release civil deposit funds (filed 9/28/20)

TENTATIVE RULING

The unopposed motion is granted. A proposed order has been served but has not been separately submitted.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAM JAMES