This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 01:10:05 (UTC).

JINHE ROSA HO VS. MUNTASER A. AMMARI

Case Summary

On 10/22/2015 JINHE ROSA HO filed an Other lawsuit against MUNTASER A AMMARI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9961

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEOPLE MOTORS

Petitioners

HO JINHE ROSA

HO JINHE ROSA DBA PEOPLE MOTORS

Respondents

AMMARI MUNTASER A.

AMMARI MUNTASER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JONES KENDALL T.

Respondent Attorney

PERRY CHRISTOPHER J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/19/2015: Minute Order

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

12/3/2015: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

DECLARATION OF M&G ENGINEERING IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD AND OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM AWARD

12/21/2015: DECLARATION OF M&G ENGINEERING IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD AND OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM AWARD

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

1/8/2016: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

1/12/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/29/2016: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/10/2016: Minute Order

JUDGMENT

2/26/2016: JUDGMENT

Minute Order

2/26/2016: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2016
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 73; Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; (Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed; Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Judgment; Filed by Ho, Jinhe Rosa dba People Motors (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • at 08:30 AM in Department B; Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 73; Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2015
  • Opposition; Filed by Muntaser A. Ammari (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Muntaser A. Ammari (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Opposition (TO PETITION TO CONFIRM AWARD AND REQUEST THAT PETITION TO CONFIRM BE DISMISSED OR ALTERNATIVELY THAT THE AWARD BE VACATED. ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • Proof of Service (OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO CONFIRM AWARD AND REQUEST THAT PETITION TO CONFIRM BE DISMISSED OR ALTERNATIVELY THAT THE AWARD BE VACATED ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Notice (OF PENDENCY OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • Notice; Filed by Jinhe Rosa Ho (Petitioner); People Motors (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Proof of Service (OF PETITION TO CONFIRM ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by People Motors (Legacy Party); Jinhe Rosa Ho (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Petition (to confirm, correct, or vacate contractual arbitration award ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Petition; Filed by Jinhe Rosa Ho (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less