Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2020 at 21:30:02 (UTC).

JIN REE VS HYUNG S LIM

Case Summary

On 11/18/2010 JIN REE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HYUNG S LIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK A. BORENSTEIN, AMY D. HOGUE, MATTHEW ST. GEORGE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9754

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

AMY D. HOGUE

MATTHEW ST. GEORGE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REE JIN

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10

LIM HYUNG S

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

2/14/2018: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

9/18/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1/24/2020: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER TRANSFERRING DEPARTMENT 44 CASE) OF 06/10/2020

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER TRANSFERRING DEPARTMENT 44 CASE) OF 06/10/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

8/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

7/7/2011: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ATTACHMENT?ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

12/1/2011: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION (ATTACHMENT?ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

2/20/2015: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

4/29/2015: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE?CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 11/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by Jin Ree (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination) of 10/16/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Jin Ree (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Jin Ree (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketDefault Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jin Ree (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC449754    Hearing Date: August 25, 2020    Dept: 34

Moving Party: Plaintiff Jin Ree

Resp. Party: None

TENTATIVE RULING:

The application and order of appearance and examination is GRANTED.

BACKGROUND:

On November 18, 2010, Plaintiff Jin Ree commenced this action against Defendant Hyung S. Lim for (1) breach of contract; (2) common counts; (3) breach of personal guaranty; and (4) violation of Code of Civil Procedure section 1719.

On February 19, 2011, the Court entered default judgment against Defendant Hyung S. Lim for $202,465.00. (02/19/2011 Judgment.)

On January 24, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant application and order for appearance and examination.

On June 10, 2020, the Court transferred this case to Department 7 of the Spring Street Courthouse due to the closure of Department 44.

On July 21, 2020, Plaintiff filed a proof of personal service of the order for appearance and examination.

On July 21, 2020, the Court issued a nunc pro tunc order of the 06/10/2020 minute order to state that “Due to the closure of Department 44, this case is hereby returned to Department 34 at the Stanley Mosk Courthouse effective June 15, 2020.”

ANALYSIS:

I. Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure section 708.110, subdivision (a) provides:

“The judgment creditor may apply to the proper court for an order requiring the judgment debtor to appear before the court, or before a referee appointed by the court, at a time and place specified in the order, to furnish information to aid in enforcement of the money judgment.”

Code of Civil Procedure section 708.110, subdivision (d) states:

“The judgment creditor shall personally serve a copy of the order on the judgment debtor not less than 10 days before the date set for the examination. Service shall be made in the manner specified in Section 415.10. Service of the order creates a lien on the personal property of the judgment debtor for a period of one year from the date of the order unless extended or sooner terminated by the court.”

II. Discussion

The Court finds that Defendant was properly served with an order for appearance and examination. (Code Civ. Proc., § 708.110 subd. (d).)

The Court GRANTS Plaintiff’s application and order of appearance and examination.