Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/29/2020 at 14:10:06 (UTC).

JIMMY MASUDA VS ERNEST FUKUMOTO

Case Summary

On 01/13/2012 JIMMY MASUDA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ERNEST FUKUMOTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE O'DONNELL and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6950

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE O'DONNELL

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MASUDA JIMMY

Defendants and Respondents

FUKUMOTO ERNEST

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Not Classified By Court

MENARD JEAN-PAUL. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FINK RANDALL C.

KAUFMAN JACK E. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

AGAWA THOMAS K. ESQ.

ROSSMAN ADAM S. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; DECLARATION OF LEE FINEMAN

10/19/2012: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; DECLARATION OF LEE FINEMAN

Minute Order -

10/19/2012: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

10/22/2012: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF HENRY YAMADA

11/21/2012: DECLARATION OF HENRY YAMADA

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

12/6/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

DEFENDANT, ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED RESPONSES TO HIS FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET NO. 1) FROM PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CAL. R. CT. 3.1020

1/25/2013: DEFENDANT, ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED RESPONSES TO HIS FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET NO. 1) FROM PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CAL. R. CT. 3.1020

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO (1) FORM INTERROGATORIES AND (2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF JIMMY MASUDA AND

3/8/2013: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO (1) FORM INTERROGATORIES AND (2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF JIMMY MASUDA AND

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING ON DIFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

3/26/2013: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RULING ON DIFENDANT?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

DEFENDANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CAL. EVID. CODE ? 664.6

7/17/2013: DEFENDANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CAL. EVID. CODE ? 664.6

Minute Order -

8/16/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

2/27/2014: Minute Order -

NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EARLY DATE FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

2/28/2014: NOTICE OF RULING RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN EARLY DATE FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

DEFENDANT & CROSS-COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED RESPONSES TO HIS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET NO.2) FROM PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CAL. R. CT. 3.1020

4/25/2014: DEFENDANT & CROSS-COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DISPUTED RESPONSES TO HIS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION (SET NO.2) FROM PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO CAL. R. CT. 3.1020

DEFENDANT & CROSS-COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO HIS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET NO.2) PURSU

7/3/2014: DEFENDANT & CROSS-COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO HIS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET NO.2) PURSU

Minute Order -

7/11/2014: Minute Order -

DECLARATION OF THOMAS K. AGAWA AS TO PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEFENDANT & CROSS-COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S EX PARTE APPLICATION PURSUANT TO CAL. R. CT. 3.1203, 3.1204

8/18/2014: DECLARATION OF THOMAS K. AGAWA AS TO PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF DEFENDANT & CROSS-COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO?S EX PARTE APPLICATION PURSUANT TO CAL. R. CT. 3.1203, 3.1204

PLAINTIFF/CROSS DEFENDANT JIMMY MASUDA?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT/CROSS- COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

9/2/2014: PLAINTIFF/CROSS DEFENDANT JIMMY MASUDA?S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT/CROSS- COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO? MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT JIMMY MASUDA?S MEMORANDUM 0F POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT/CROSS- COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING IMPERMISSIBLE

9/9/2014: PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT JIMMY MASUDA?S MEMORANDUM 0F POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT/CROSS- COMPLAINANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING IMPERMISSIBLE

151 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; (OSC RE Dismissal; Matter continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-11-12 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Jimmy Masuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68; Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-09-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
312 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketOSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jimmy Masuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT: (I) TO QUIET TITLE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jimmy Masuda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ADAM S. ROSSMAN, ESQ. (SBN 175838)

Attorney at Law FILED

6338 Trancas Cyn. Rd. SUPERIOR COURT OF GGaLes

Malibu, CA 90013 .

T: (310) 592-4837 SEP 07 2012

Attorney for Defendant ERNEST FUKUMOTO Sohn A. Clarke, Executive Offieer/Clerk BY Ofi\\ , Deputy

Rpul dancnel

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

JIMMY MASUDA, CASE NO.: BC476950

Plaintiff, Unlimited Jurisdiction V. Assigned for All Purposes to the

Hon. Joanne B. O’ Donnell, Dept. 37 ERNEST FUKUMOTO and DOES 1

through 20, Inclusive, : DEFENDANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO’S

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND

Defendant. AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO

PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITON TO HIS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE VERIFIED 1ST AMENDED

AND RELATED CROSS ACTION COMPLAINT UNDER CAL. C1V. PROC. CODE § 438 & COMMON LAW

Hearing: Date: September 14, 2012

Time: 9:00 a.m.

Dept: 37

111 N. Hill St., L.A., CA 90012

T: (213) 974-5649

Action Filed: 01/13/2012/Tnal: 07/17/2013

DEFENDANT ERNEST FUKUMOTO'S NOTICE OF AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGAWA THOMAS K. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSSMAN ADAM STEVEN