Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 11:18:28 (UTC).

JIMMY BROWN VS TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/07/2012 JIMMY BROWN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MEL RED RECANA and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5240

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MEL RED RECANA

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BROWN JIMMY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

SANDRA BIEDA ERRONEOUSY SUED AS SANDRA

TESORO COMPANIES INC.

TESORO PETROLEUM INC.

TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY

VITA SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF IRVING MEYER

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MANATT PHELPS & PHILLIPS LLP

DE RECAT CRAIG J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

11/7/2012: SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: (1) DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF DISABILITY IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

11/7/2012: PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: (1) DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF DISABILITY IN VIOLATION OF FEHA; ETC

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

11/28/2012: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

11/28/2012: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/28/2012: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

12/12/2012: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF MINUTES ENTERED DECEMBER 14, 2012

12/19/2012: NOTICE OF MINUTES ENTERED DECEMBER 14, 2012

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

1/3/2013: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

1/8/2013: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

DEFENDANT TESORO COMPANIES, INC.?S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANT TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

1/11/2013: DEFENDANT TESORO COMPANIES, INC.?S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANT TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY?S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT SANDRA BIEDA?S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN

2/1/2013: DEFENDANT SANDRA BIEDA?S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/17/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

5/20/2013: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -

PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN?S NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/23/2013: PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN?S NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: (1) DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF DISABILITY IN VIOLATION OF FEHA;

5/23/2013: PLAINTIFF JIMMY BROWN?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: (1) DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF DISABILITY IN VIOLATION OF FEHA;

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/7/2013: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF DEMURRER ANL) DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY AND TESORO COMPANIES, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/21/2013: NOTICE OF DEMURRER ANL) DEMURRER BY DEFENDANTS TESORO REFINING AND MARKETING COMPANY AND TESORO COMPANIES, INC. TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order -

12/11/2013: Minute Order -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketPaper file imaged and destroyed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2013
  • Docketat 08:35 am in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer (Motion to dismiss re party served) - Off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DocketRequest and Entry of Dismissal (entire action with prejudice ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Docketat 08:35 am in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (AND JOINDER) - Trial Date Set

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • DocketNotice (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketNotice (OF INTENT TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketDefendant's Demurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • DocketNotice (re: 12-14-12 ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice (Reassigned to Mel Red RecanaDept 45) - Court makes order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (AND COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons (COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • DocketAffidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (170.6 - MOONEY ); Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • DocketNotice (OF CMC ); Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tesoro Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE RECAT CRAIG J. ESQ.