Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2019 at 22:42:50 (UTC).

JILL LAWLER VS BIKRAM CHOUDHURY ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2015 JILL LAWLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BIKRAM CHOUDHURY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIA WEINBACH and NANCY L. NEWMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2579

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELIA WEINBACH

NANCY L. NEWMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAWLER JILL

Defendants and Respondents

BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA L.P.

CHOUDHURY BIKRAM

DOES 1 TO 25

RAJASHREE CHOUDHURY

BRIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA L.P.

CHOUDHURY RAJASHREE

Other

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC

Interested Party and Not Classified By Court

LEVENE NEALE BENDER YOO & BRILL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SHEA LAW OFFICE

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC.

HAGEBOLS MARY SHEA

SHEA LAW OFFICES

REED WILLIAM

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES

SHEA MARY JOSEPHINE

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ALBRIGHT YEE & SCHMIT LLP

HUREVITZ LINDA B. ESQ.

PUJJI RAMNIK SINGH

HUREVITZ LINDA B.

DENTONS US LLP

BALLARD ROSENBERG GOLPER & SAVITT LLP

KELSON ANNE S.

PUJJI NICK S.

MARYANSKI DONNA M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/27/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

6/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

9/18/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/14/2018: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

12/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for

Case Management Statement

1/11/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

1/28/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. SEX-BASED DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT [CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51; ETC

2/13/2015: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. SEX-BASED DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT [CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51; ETC

SUMMONS

2/13/2015: SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/16/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

5/15/2015: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA, L.P. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

7/21/2015: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT BIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA, L.P. TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

STIPULATION AND ORDER

7/22/2015: STIPULATION AND ORDER

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

9/25/2015: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

1/19/2016: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

DEFENDANT BIKRAM CHOUDHURY?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL AN INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF ANNE S. KELSON AND FRANCINE KUL

3/1/2016: DEFENDANT BIKRAM CHOUDHURY?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL AN INDEPENDENT MENTAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF ANNE S. KELSON AND FRANCINE KUL

Minute Order

4/14/2016: Minute Order

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Bikram Choudhury (Defendant); BRIKRAM'S YOGA COLLEGE OF INDIA, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Jill Lawler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Jill Lawler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Bikram Choudhury (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department P; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Jill Lawler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
324 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2015
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Minute order entered: 2015-02-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER (CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Jill Lawler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. SEX-BASED DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF THE UNRUH CIVIL RIGHTS ACT [CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 51; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/1961
  • Declaration; Filed by Jill Lawler (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/1961
  • Declaration (OF MARY J. SHEA ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC572579    Hearing Date: December 07, 2020    Dept: M

CASE NAME: Jill Lawler v. Bikram Choudhury, et al.

CASE NUMBER: BC572579

MOTION: Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Bikram Choudhury

HEARING DATE: 12/7/2020

Legal Standard

“The service of a deposition notice under Section 2025.240 is effective to require any deponent who is a party to the action or an officer, director, managing agent, or employee of a party to attend and to testify, as well as to produce any document, electronically stored information, or tangible thing for inspection and copying.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.280(a).)

“If, after service of a deposition notice, a party to the action or an officer, director, managing agent, or employee of a party. . . without having served a valid objection under Section 2025.410, fails to appear for examination. . . the party giving the notice may move for an order compelling the deponent's attendance and testimony. . . . (Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.450(a).)

If a motion under subdivision (a) is granted, the court shall impose a monetary sanction under Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 2023.010) in favor of the party who noticed the deposition and against the deponent or the party with whom the deponent is affiliated, unless the court finds that the one subject to the sanction acted with substantial justification or that other circumstances make the imposition of the sanction unjust.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 2025.450(g).)

ANALYSIS

The motion is MOOT. The Court entered a stipulation and order regarding the sequencing of depositions on November 24, 2020. The Court ordered that the deposition of Defendant BIKRAM CHOUDHURY was to be completed by February 28, 2021 virtually via Zoom or similar platform. The court further ordered that the depositions of Allison Lawler and Katherine Lawler shall go forward only after Defendant BIKRAM CHOUDHURY is deposed by Plaintiff. (See 11/24/2020 Stip & Order at 4.)

The Court reminds parties to take their motions off calendar and call the Court once circumstances make their motions moot. When parties leave moot motions on calendar, they prevent other litigants from making reservations on the Court’s calendar.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bikram's Yoga College of India, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEVENE NEALE BENDER YOO & BRILL L.L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUREVITZ LINDA B.