This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 12:52:30 (UTC).

JIANGSU GUOTAI INTL GROUP GUOMAO CO LTD VS BLVD BRANDS LLC E

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 JIANGSU GUOTAI INTL GROUP GUOMAO CO LTD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BLVD BRANDS LLC E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7221

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL GROUP GUOMAO

Defendants and Respondents

BOULEVARD BRANDS LLC

BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS LLC

GUEZ DANIEL

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

PH1 LLC DOE 2

PICO DE ORO LLC DOE 1

AMY GUEZ AS TRUSTEE OF ISABELLA DOE 4

AMY GUEZ AS TRUSTEE OF DYLAN GUEZ DOE 5

DOE 6:

DANIEL GUEZ AS TRUSTEE DOE 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SAUL REISS P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

K&L GATES LLP

KIM MITCHELL

SPERTUS LANDES & UMHOFER LLP

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/11/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

3/15/2016: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

APPLICATION FOR B. JOHN CASEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC, AND DANIEL GUEZ; ETC.

3/29/2016: APPLICATION FOR B. JOHN CASEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC, AND DANIEL GUEZ; ETC.

NOTICE OF RULING ON APPLICATION FOR B. JORN CASEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC, AND DANIEL GUEZ

4/28/2016: NOTICE OF RULING ON APPLICATION FOR B. JORN CASEY TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR DEFENDANTS BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC, AND DANIEL GUEZ

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING OPPRESSIVE DISCOVERY REQUESTS PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFFS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE E.

8/12/2016: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING OPPRESSIVE DISCOVERY REQUESTS PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFFS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF STEPHANIE E.

OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS- DEFENDANT JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL GROUP GUOMAO CO., LTD TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC AND DANIEL GUEZ?S EX PART

10/18/2016: OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS- DEFENDANT JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL GROUP GUOMAO CO., LTD TO DEFENDANTS/CROSS- COMPLAINANTS BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC AND DANIEL GUEZ?S EX PART

Unknown

1/4/2017: Unknown

Unknown

1/4/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL GROUP GUOMAO CO., LTD FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, ETC

1/24/2017: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL GROUP GUOMAO CO., LTD FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE, ETC

DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF

2/16/2017: DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF

STIPULATION REGARDING DOE DEFENDANTS

2/23/2017: STIPULATION REGARDING DOE DEFENDANTS

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

2/28/2017: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

3/22/2017: ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

DECLARATION OF JEFFREY R. LEIGHT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

4/5/2017: DECLARATION OF JEFFREY R. LEIGHT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Minute Order

4/6/2017: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

5/9/2017: DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

5/9/2017: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/23/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

143 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 44; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (Judgment Debtor Examination Hrng; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • APPL. & ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAM. (ATT.-ENF OF JUDGEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Writ issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 62; Unknown Event Type - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
296 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jiangsu Guotai International Group Guomao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jiangsu Guotai International Group Guomao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jiangsu Guotai International Group Guomao (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT - GOODS ORDERED AND DELIVERED TO DEFENDANT BEACH; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 62; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

. ‘- ¢ P : e r e | .’\ i ‘e e & ietie e 1 s e smmre tmmbe ma 4t 4 eases Ae e etaneneaeeeeeih eeleA

. FILED Saul Reiss, SBN 48528 ~ Superior Court of California Fay Pugh, SBN 198708 County of Los Angeles Law Offices of Saul Reiss, P.C. . 2800 28" Street, Suite 328 JUL 142017 Santa Monica, CA 50405 Sherri R, Carter, Executive Gificer/Clegk

Tel.: 310-450-2888 Fax.: 310-450-2885 By Email: reisslaw@verizon.net

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JJANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL ) Case No.: BC607221

GROUP GUOMAO CO., LTD, [Assigned to the Honorable Michael L. Stern — Dept. “62”]

Plaintiff,

[RRERESER]

14 VS. JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, a ) Complaint Filed: January 15,2016 California Limited Liability Company; ) FSC: August 14,2017 - BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC, a ) Jury Trial Date: August 21,2017 California Limited Liability Company; DANIEL GUEZ, an individual and DOES 1

18 || through 50, inclusive,

‘Defendants. 20 || BOULEVARD BRANDS, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; . ,2,1 BEACH HOUSE HOLDINGS, LLC, a " 55 || California Limited Liability Company; DANIEL GUEZ, an individual, 23 Cross-Complainants, V8.

25 || JIANGSU GUOTAI INTERNATIONAL

|| GROUP GUOMAO CO., LTD, a business 2 26 || entity organized under the laws of the People’s Republic of China, and ROES 100 " 21 through 200, inclusive, 28 |- Cro§s-Defendants.

— p—st — s — — —t ~J N W LD N p—t o O o0 ~Jp—t e e A S NN

e’N