This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/17/2019 at 08:43:31 (UTC).

JIAN CHENG LIN VS GERRI LIN

Case Summary

On 08/30/2012 JIAN CHENG LIN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GERRI LIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Central Civil West Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTINE BYRD, BYRD, CHRISTINE, BUCKLEY, DANIEL J., SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT, ROSEN, DAVID A., LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT, HANSELL, DEAN and WEINGART, GREGORY J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9990

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTINE BYRD

BYRD, CHRISTINE

BUCKLEY, DANIEL J.

SILVERMAN, B. SCOTT

ROSEN, DAVID A.

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

HANSELL, DEAN

WEINGART, GREGORY J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIN JIAN CHENG

Defendant

ZOU YUANMEI

Respondents

LIN GERRI

PERRY ALLAN EARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

BERSHATSKY KEITH DAVID

PERRY ALLAN EARL

SANDJAYA ALVIN

WONG BESSIE LAI WAH

Other Attorneys

FLORES MATIAS

KHALAF TED

PERRY ALLAN E

SALOMON JONI BELL

MATHEWS CHARLES THEODORE

CHANG GRACE LEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 311, Byrd, Christine, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (to continue and reset trial date ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Stipulation (to Continue Trial; Declaration of Gerri Lin ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 311, Byrd, Christine, Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Notice - Limited Scope Representation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
659 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2012
  • Response (Amended - On Behalf of: Respondent: Lin, Gerri - Filed and Entered on 2012-12-06 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • Response ((1st amended - On Behalf of: Respondent: Lin, Gerri ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Response (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Lin, Gerri - Filed and Entered on 2012-09-24 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 09-27-12 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Proof of Service of Summons (PERSONAL - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lin, Jian ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2012
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 09-27-12 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Lin, Jian ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2012
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • Notice - Association of Counsel (BY RESPONDENT )

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: BD569990 Hearing Date: September 17, 2021 Dept: 42

\r\n\r\n

On April 7, 2013. Plaintiff\r\nGerri Lin filed a civil action against Defendant Yuanmei Zou and others, Case\r\nNo. KC 065 922. The case was deemed “related” to a family law\r\ndissolution case that was already pending, Case No. BD 569 990.

\r\n\r\n

From July 5, 2017, through and including February 27, 2018, sanctions\r\nwere imposed against Plaintiff Lin and in favor of Defendant Yuanmei Zou in the\r\namount of $72,235.

\r\n\r\n

On June 22, 2018, Judgment was entered in Case No. KC 065 922 in favor\r\nof Defendant Yuanmei Zou and against Plaintiff Gerri Lin in the amount of $74,631.45,\r\nincluding interest accrued to date and with interest at the legal rate to accrue \r\nthereafter.

\r\n\r\n

On September 6, 2018, Defendant Yuanmei Zou filed a Notice of Lien in\r\nthe related action, Case. No. BD 569 990, for the entirety of the sanctions\r\nplus interest.

\r\n\r\n

On August 26, 2021, Defendant and judgment creditor Yuanmei Zou filed a motion to enforce the judgment\r\nlien. The motion satisfies the\r\nrequirements of Rule 3.1360 of the California Rules of Court, including the total\r\namount due, which is $98,458.61 as of today, September 17, 2021.

\r\n\r\n

After consideration of\r\nthe motion and in the exercise of the court’s discretion, the motion to enforce\r\nthe judgment lien is GRANTED and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Petitioner Jian\r\nCheng Lin shall not transfer any money or property to Respondent Gerri Lin\r\nuntil it can be levied upon or otherwise applied to the satisfaction of the\r\nlien of Yuanmei Zou.

\r\n\r\n'b"

Case Number: BD569990 Hearing Date: August 18, 2021 Dept: 42

\r\n\r\n

Jian\r\nCheng Lin v. Gerri Lin, Case No. BD 569\r\n990

\r\n\r\n

Petitioner's\r\nMotions in Limine Nos. 1 - 5:

\r\n\r\n

Nos.\r\n1 and 2: To exclude all evidence\r\nregarding two real properties located in China. Tentative: DENY. This court can\r\nadjudicate the community interest and make orders regarding the parties who are\r\ngetting divorced. The sister is not an essential party.

\r\n\r\n

No.\r\n3: To exclude all evidence related to the\r\ncivil suit filed by Respondent, KC 065 922. Tentative: DENY. The case\r\nwas dismissed under the 5-year rule for lack of prosecution. It may or\r\nmay not have any relevance in the dissolution trial.

\r\n\r\n

No.\r\n4: To exclude evidence that is not\r\nrelevant. Tentative: DENY. No\r\nspecific evidence is identified. Objections\r\nto specific testimony or exhibits may be raised during trial.

\r\n\r\n

No.\r\n5: To exclude any exhibits not marked in\r\ncompliance with Local Rules 3.52 and 3.53. \r\nTentative: DENY. No specific\r\nexhibit is identified. Objections to\r\nspecific exhibits may be raised during trial.

\r\n\r\n"
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALOMON JONI BELL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATHEWS CHARLES T.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG GRACE LEA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLORES MATIAS FERNANDO