This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 22:30:43 (UTC).

JESUS REMEDIOS AVALOS-TOVAR VS ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 02/18/2016 JESUS REMEDIOS AVALOS-TOVAR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6060

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AVALOS-TOVAR JEUS REMEDIOS

AVALOS-TOVAR JESUS REMEDIOS

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Not Classified By Court

SAHVER KORFF & CASTRONOVO LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FOWLER JASON

FOWLER JASON PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

ASHLEY LANE L

ASHLEY LANE JOHN

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION

7/21/2011: DECLARATION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DEMURRER

7/21/2011: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DEMURRER

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/18/2016: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2. CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD; 3. RESCISSION; 4. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 5. BREACH OF CONTRACT.

2/18/2016: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2. CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD; 3. RESCISSION; 4. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 5. BREACH OF CONTRACT.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

2/18/2016: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

2/18/2016: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

SUMMONS

2/18/2016: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/17/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF CELIA MOUTES-LEE REGARDING MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIVIL. 4330.41 (A)(2)

4/4/2016: DECLARATION OF CELIA MOUTES-LEE REGARDING MEET AND CONFER PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIVIL. 4330.41 (A)(2)

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

5/4/2016: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/17/2016: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INCS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Unknown

5/31/2016: Unknown

Unknown

5/31/2016: Unknown

DECLARATION

6/3/2016: DECLARATION

Minute Order

6/15/2016: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

6/17/2016: DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL

DECLARATION

6/17/2016: DECLARATION

NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/21/2016: NOTICE OF RULING RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

236 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Notice (Request For Clarification); Filed by Alliance United Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Jesus Remedios Avalos-Tovar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Decision on Motion for Summary Judgment) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Decision on...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Alliance United Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Alliance United Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Decision on Motion for Summary Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE); Filed by Jesus Remedios Avalos-Tovar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
547 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. DECLARATORY RELIEF; 2. CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUD; 3. RESCISSION; 4. BREACH OF THE IMPLIED COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING; 5. BREACH OF CONTRACT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHAVER KORFF CASTRONOVO LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOWLER JASON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOWLER JASON PAUL