This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 09:05:37 (UTC).

JESUS CONTRERAS ET AL VS EMILY KOPIT

Case Summary

On 03/02/2015 JESUS CONTRERAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EMILY KOPIT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3197

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CONTRERAS CHRISTIAN

CONTRERAS JESUS

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

KOPIT EMILY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MAX DRAITSER

Defendant Attorneys

MATSUDA JANE OLIVAS ESQ.

MATSUDA JANE O. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

KOTHARY PRITESH S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/2/2015: Unknown

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/2/2015: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

3/2/2015: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

4/13/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

EMILY KOPIT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

5/26/2015: EMILY KOPIT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/26/2015: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR COMPLETE INDEMNITY, PARTIAL INDEMNITY, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

5/26/2015: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR COMPLETE INDEMNITY, PARTIAL INDEMNITY, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/25/2015: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/25/2015: CIVIL DEPOSIT

GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/25/2015: GENERAL DENIAL TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

10/22/2015: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/26/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CHECK ALERT

3/10/2016: CHECK ALERT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/17/2016: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

1/5/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

1/31/2017: NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Minute Order

5/4/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

5/16/2017: NOTICE OF RULING AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2019
  • Receipt; Filed by Emily Kopit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Jesus Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Jesus Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; Unknown Event Type - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2015
  • SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • EMILY KOPIT'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR COMPLETE INDEMNITY, PARTIAL INDEMNITY, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Summons; Filed by Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jesus Contreras (Plaintiff); Christian Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • Complaint; Filed by Jesus Contreras (Plaintiff); Christian Contreras (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC573197    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 4A

Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise

Having considered the petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows.  No opposing papers were filed.

BACKGROUND

On March 2, 2015, Plaintiffs Jesus Contreras and Christian Contreras filed a complaint against Defendant Emily Kopit.

On May 26, 2015, Defendant/Cross-Complainant Emily Kopit filed a cross-complaint against Plaintiff/Cross-Defendant Jesus Contreras seeking complete indemnity, partial indemnity, and declaratory relief.

On October 21, 2019, Petitioner Mary Contreras filed a petition to approve compromise of pending action for Plaintiff Christian Contreras.

PARTY’S REQUESTS

Petitioner Mary Contreras (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to grant a petition to approve a compromise of pending action for Plaintiff Christian Contreras (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952(a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Claimant’s attendance is not required due to his age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the petition is properly approved.

Defendant/Cross-Complainant Emily Kopit is to pay Claimant a gross settlement of $20,000 for a facial abrasion and sprain/strain that Claimant sustained from an automobile collision.  $5,662.64 of the gross settlement is to pay for outstanding medical expenses.  $662.64 of the $5,662.64 amount is to be paid to a private health insurance or a self-funded plan under a Non-ERISA self-funded plan.  $5000 of the $5,662.64 amount is to be paid to West Los Angeles Chiropractic located at 11340 W. Olympic Blvd., Ste. 165, Los Angeles, CA 90064.  No attorney’s fees or costs are to be taken from the gross settlement.  The remaining net settlement of $14,337.36 is to be deposited in an insured account located at Wells Fargo Bank, Hawthorne Main Branch, 13545 Hawthorne Blvd., Hawthorne, CA 90250 subject to withdrawal only upon the authorization of the Court.

The petition for minor’s compromise filed on October 21, 2019 for Claimant is APPROVED.

The Court shall sign the proposed order approving Claimant’s petition and the proposed order depositing funds into a blocked account, both of which were concurrently filed with the petition.

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.