This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 05:11:26 (UTC).

JESSY BARBOUR VS SCOT BARBOUR

Case Summary

On 01/14/2008 JESSY BARBOUR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SCOT BARBOUR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ZUKIN, HELEN, SCADUTO, LYNN H., ST. GEORGE, MATTHEW, GROSS, MARC D., DURON, ARMANDO, JUHAS, MARK A., GOLDBERG, HANK M., GORDON, SCOTT M., COWAN, DAVID J., COURT, MICHELLE WILLIAMS, GOLDBERG, HANK M, GORDON, SCOTT M and WILLIAMS COURT, MICHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5734

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ZUKIN, HELEN

SCADUTO, LYNN H.

ST. GEORGE, MATTHEW

GROSS, MARC D.

DURON, ARMANDO

JUHAS, MARK A.

GOLDBERG, HANK M.

GORDON, SCOTT M.

COWAN, DAVID J.

COURT, MICHELLE WILLIAMS

GOLDBERG, HANK M

GORDON, SCOTT M

WILLIAMS COURT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MELOWICZ JESSY

BARBOUR JESSY

Claimants

APPLE INC. 401K PLAN # 85086

CARTER-LOURENSZ M.D. JANICE

BRUERS STUART E.

Respondent

BARBOUR SCOT

Others and Petitioners

BARBOUR JESSY

CLERK

KERN COUNTY CSSD

Interested Party and Claimant

CARTER-LOURENSZ M.D. JANICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

FRAZEE ROSEANN

FRIEDLANDER MICHELE COBIN

MOSES ERIC M.

ROBINS PAULINE Y.

WEINSTEIN ALLIE

MOSES ERIC MARK

ROSENBERG CHARLES

Claimant and Interested Party Attorneys

MARKS LAWRENCE

MARDIROSSIAN GARO

MARKS LAWRENCE D.

Other Attorneys

AMY L. NEIMAN

SALOMON JONI BELL

MCCARTHY MARJORIE M.

LEE LISA W.

SPILLER WILLIAM

LEE LISA

SALOMON JONI ELLISHIA

NEIMAN AMY L.

SPILLER WILLIAM JR

LEE LISA W

 

Court Documents

Brief - of Minor's Consel

9/19/2017: Brief - of Minor's Consel

Case File - Public

4/27/2009: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

2/26/2010: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

4/29/2010: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

10/29/2010: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

12/30/2011: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

12/20/2012: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

6/26/2013: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

11/7/2013: Case File - Public

Other

1/24/2014: Other

Case File - Public

4/18/2014: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

8/22/2014: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

10/24/2014: Case File - Public

Case File - Public

7/24/2015: Case File - Public

Case Document

9/4/2015: Case Document

Family (Conversion) - Case Document - FAMILY

2/29/2016: Family (Conversion) - Case Document - FAMILY

JUDGEMENT

2/29/2016: JUDGEMENT

Case Document

2/29/2016: Case Document

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice - Registration of California Support Order (FL651); Filed by Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice - Association of Counsel; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice (petn's rfo ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 84, Zukin, Helen, Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketResponsive Declaration; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 84, Zukin, Helen, Presiding; Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketOrder - Attend Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketOrder - Attend Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
1,203 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2008
  • DocketResponse (to pet - On Behalf of: Respondent: Barbour, Scot - Filed and Entered on 2008-04-09 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2008
  • DocketResponse (- On Behalf of: Respondent: Barbour, Scot ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2008
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (resp's - On Behalf of: Respondent: Barbour, Scot - Filed and Entered on 2008-04-09 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2008
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Melowicz, Jessy - Filed and Entered on 2008-02-01 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for child custody evaluation pursuant - Granted on 2009-12-10 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Melowicz, Jessy - Filed and Entered on 2008-01-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • DocketPetition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Melowicz, Jessy - Filed and Entered on 2008-01-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • DocketPetition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Barbour, Jessy ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • DocketReassigned From LASC - West (Reassigned from LASC-West )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • DocketSummons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Melowicz, Jessy - Filed and Entered on 2008-01-14 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLERK is a litigant

Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE LISA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCARTHY MARJORIE M.