This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2017 at 22:04:29 (UTC).

JESSE CHAVEZ ET AL VS ALDRICH CHEMICAL COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/18/2012 JESSE CHAVEZ filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against ALDRICH CHEMICAL COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY E. KENDIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2678

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY E. KENDIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

CHAVEZ DORA

CHAVEZ JESSE

Defendants and Respondents

AAROMA HOLDINGS LLC

ADVANCED BIOTECH

ALDRICH CHEMICAL COMPANY

BASF CORPORATION

BASF SE

BERJE INCORPORATED

BLUE PACIFIC FLAVORS

BUSH BOAKE ALLEN INC.

CENTROME INC.

CHR HANSEN INC.

CITRUS & ALLIED ESSENCES LTD.

DAVID MICHAEL & CO. INC.

DSM FOOD SPECIALTIES B.V.

DSM FOOD SPECIALTIES USA INC.

DUANE STREET LLC

ELAN CHEMICAL COMPANY INC.

FIRMENICH INC.

FLAVORCHEM CORPORATION

39 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DUNN BRIAN T. ESQ.

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GILFORD LISA ESQ.

CORLESS THOMAS C. ESQ.

MEYER JASON F. ESQ.

CLARKE THOMAS H. JR. ESQ.

AMEELE KEITH M. ESQ.

BOOTH JASON M. ESQ.

GOLDBERG A. SCOTT ESQ.

UFKES FREDERICK J. ESQ.

OMAR A. IQBAL ESQ.

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN

HAKE WILLIAM M. ESQ.

ENDRES RICHARD S. ESQ.

WALSWORTH FRANKLIN BEVINS & MCCALL

JESUS J. TORRES

MILLER DEANNE L. ESQ.

ALSON & BIRD

BRYAN CAVE LLP

COHEN-KATZ DEIDRE F. ESQ.

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TOXIC INJURIES ASSERTING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/26/2012: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TOXIC INJURIES ASSERTING CAUSES OF ACTION FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

Unknown

7/25/2012: Unknown

NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR THE ADMISSION OF DAVID E. KAWALA TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. VINNICK; VERIFIED APPLI

8/13/2012: NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR THE ADMISSION OF DAVID E. KAWALA TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. VINNICK; VERIFIED APPLI

DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT HENRY H OTTENS MANUFACTURING CO., INC. TO FRAUDULENT CONCEALMENT CAUSE OF ACTION IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/6/2012: DEMURRER BY DEFENDANT HENRY H OTTENS MANUFACTURING CO., INC. TO FRAUDULENT CONCEALMENT CAUSE OF ACTION IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

9/13/2012: Proof of Service

DEFENDANT PENTA INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/13/2012: DEFENDANT PENTA INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANT GOLD COAST INGREDIENTS

9/14/2012: ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANT GOLD COAST INGREDIENTS

MINUTE ORDER

10/5/2012: MINUTE ORDER

DEFENDANT CITRUS AND ALLIED ESSENCES LTDI?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/5/2012: DEFENDANT CITRUS AND ALLIED ESSENCES LTDI?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT?S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

FLEURCHEM, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/15/2013: FLEURCHEM, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS? THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT OLAUGHLIN INJFLJSTIU IS INC.?S SUPPLFMFNTAI. FILING REGARDING ITS NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING JOY SYRCLE TO API?EAR AS COUNSEL PRO TIAC VICE; DECLARATION OF MARGARET F. DELLE

3/21/2013: DEFENDANT OLAUGHLIN INJFLJSTIU IS INC.?S SUPPLFMFNTAI. FILING REGARDING ITS NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ALLOWING JOY SYRCLE TO API?EAR AS COUNSEL PRO TIAC VICE; DECLARATION OF MARGARET F. DELLE

DEFENDANT O?LAUGHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.?S AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO PRO H.4C VICE APPLICATION OF MICHELLE CORRIGA

3/21/2013: DEFENDANT O?LAUGHLIN INDUSTRIES, INC.?S AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO PRO H.4C VICE APPLICATION OF MICHELLE CORRIGA

REPLY BY DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. AND BUSH BOAKE ALLEN INC. IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT;

7/3/2013: REPLY BY DEFENDANTS INTERNATIONAL FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC. AND BUSH BOAKE ALLEN INC. IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS? THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT;

DEFENDANTS' ORDER RE: STAY PROCEEDINGS

7/17/2013: DEFENDANTS' ORDER RE: STAY PROCEEDINGS

PLAINTHFS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ON DR. CHARLES PUE AND CLEVELAND CLINIC ISSUED BY DEFENDANT MOTHER MURPHY?S

5/21/2014: PLAINTHFS? REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS ON DR. CHARLES PUE AND CLEVELAND CLINIC ISSUED BY DEFENDANT MOTHER MURPHY?S

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/4/2015: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

ORDER PERMITTING STEVEN E. CRICK TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

7/15/2015: ORDER PERMITTING STEVEN E. CRICK TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BAKERS SERVICES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/8/2016: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BAKERS SERVICES, INC.'S APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

730 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITH PREJUDICE, THE COMPLAINT AS TO BROLITE PRODUCTS INC. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Notice of Continuance Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, THE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DANISCO USA, ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (WITH PREJUDICE, THE COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT AS TO MOTHER MURPHY'S LABORATORIES, INC. ONLY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Notice-Settlement (AMENDED CONDITIONAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Notice-Settlement (UNCONDITIONAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (COMPLAINT AS TO CITRUS & ALLIED ESSENCES,LTD, ONLY. WITH PREJUDICE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Stipulation (AND ORDER RE: AMENDMENTS TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
485 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • First Amended Complaint (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2012
  • Proof of Service Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2012
  • Proof-Service/Summons (x2 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2012
  • Application-Miscellaneous (X2 PRO HAC VICE ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less