This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 17:05:00 (UTC).

JERRY TORRES VS CHRISTIAN NAVARRO

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 JERRY TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CHRISTIAN NAVARRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LORI ANN FOURNIER, RAUL A. SAHAGUN, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4566

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LORI ANN FOURNIER

RAUL A. SAHAGUN

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RODRIGUEZ PATRICIA

TORRES JERRY

RODIGUEZ PATRICIA AN INDIVIDUAL AND GAL

TORRES JERRY AN INDIVIDUAL

Respondents and Defendants

COLLARO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 90

COLLARO FAMILY TRUST

COLLARO DANIEL LEROY

NAVARRO CHRISTIAN

COLLARO DANIEL LEROY AN INDIVIDUAL

COLLARO DANIEL

NAVARRO CHRISTIAN AN INDIVIDUAL

Minors

C.T.

S.T.

Not Classified By Court

COURTROOM VIEW NETWORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HOMAMPOUR LAW FIRM THE

HOMAMPOUR ARASH ESQ.

HOMAMPOUR ARASH

LANGER MAJOR A. ESQ.

HOMAMPOUR LAW FIRM

HOMAMPOUR ARASH LAW

SAFARIAN ARMINE

Defendant Attorneys

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY

SAFARIAN AROUTUN HARRY ESQ.

SAFARIAN FIRM THE

BABAIAN PIERRO H.

IREY JAMES WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER HEARING OF 11/12/19

11/12/2019: Order - ORDER HEARING OF 11/12/19

Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS BRIEF RE USE OF GRAPHICS AND OTHER DEMONSTRATIVE ITEMS DURING OPENING STATEMENT

2/5/2020: Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS BRIEF RE USE OF GRAPHICS AND OTHER DEMONSTRATIVE ITEMS DURING OPENING STATEMENT

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED ACTS OF VIOLENCE BETWEEN CHRISTIAN NAVARRO AND SUSAN ESQUIVEL

2/5/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED ACTS OF VIOLENCE BETWEEN CHRISTIAN NAVARRO AND SUSAN ESQUIVEL

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE BY WAY OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OR OTHER MEAN (NO ORDER) S

6/16/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE BY WAY OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OR OTHER MEAN (NO ORDER) S

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING "DAY IN LIFE" VIDEO (NO ORDER)

6/16/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING PLAINTIFFS FROM INTRODUCING "DAY IN LIFE" VIDEO (NO ORDER)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL VIDEOS DURING OPENING STATEMENTS (NO ORDER)

6/16/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19 TO EXCLUDE ANY AND ALL VIDEOS DURING OPENING STATEMENTS (NO ORDER)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

6/25/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF CONDITIONAL NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE

7/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO BIFURCATE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION IN LIMINE MOTIONS IN LIMINE; TRIAL SETTING ...)

10/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION IN LIMINE MOTIONS IN LIMINE; TRIAL SETTING ...)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED ACTS OF VIOLENCE BETWEEN CHRISTIAN NAVARRO AND SUSAN ESQUI

12/3/2020: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED ACTS OF VIOLENCE BETWEEN CHRISTIAN NAVARRO AND SUSAN ESQUI

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

8/29/2016: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Demurrer

4/4/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Demurrer

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

4/14/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Opposition

Declaration - Declaration of Arash Homampour Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition

11/1/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Arash Homampour Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

3/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/16/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

8/29/2016: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PLAINTIFF PATRICIA RODRIGUEZ' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR, PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR QUASH DEFENDANTS' SUBPOENA TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC & SOCIAL SERVICES, FOR PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYME

10/13/2016: PLAINTIFF PATRICIA RODRIGUEZ' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR, PROTECTIVE ORDER AND/OR QUASH DEFENDANTS' SUBPOENA TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC & SOCIAL SERVICES, FOR PLAINTIFF'S EMPLOYME

351 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • Hearing02/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department R at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Hearing on Motion in Limine Motions in limine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Hearing02/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department R at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Hearing on Motion in Limine (Motions in limine) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference (via LA COURT CONNECT OR WEBEX) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion in Limine Motions in limine; Trial Setting ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion in Limine Motions in limine; Trial Setting ...) of 12/11/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketObjection (DEFENDANTS? OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS? RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED ACTS OF VIOLENCE BETWEEN CHRISTIAN NAVARRO AND SUSAN ESQUIVEL); Filed by Collaro Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Daniel Leroy Collaro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketReply (Plaintiffs? Response to Defendants? Reply to Plaintiffs? Supplemental Opposition to Defendants? MIL No. 7 to Preclude Evidence of Acts of Violence Between Christian Navarro and Susan Esquivel); Filed by Patricia Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Jerry Torres (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketReply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 RE: PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED ACTS OF VIOLENCE BETWEEN CHRISTIAN NAVARRO AND SUSAN ESQUIVEL); Filed by Collaro Property Management, Inc. (Defendant); Daniel Leroy Collaro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Hearing on Motion in Limine (Motions in limine) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
557 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint Filed-No Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (AS TO MINOR S.T. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem (AS TO MINOR C.T. ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerry Torres (Plaintiff); JERRY TORRES (Plaintiff); RODIGUEZ, PATRICIA an individual and GAL (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC624566    Hearing Date: November 27, 2019    Dept: C

TORRES v. NAVARRO

CASE NO.:  BC624566

HEARING: 11/27/19

JUDGE: RAUL A. SAHAGUN

#12

TENTATIVE ORDER

Plaintiffs’ Motion for Leave to File a Fourth Amended Complaint is DENIED.

Opposing Party to give Notice.

California recognizes “a general rule of…liberal allowance of amendments…” (Nestle v. City of Santa Monica (1972) 6 Cal.3d 920, 939.) It has also long been recognized that “even if the proposed legal theory is a novel one, ‘the preferable practice would be to permit the amendment and allow the parties to test its legal sufficiency by demurrer, motion for judgment on the pleadings or other appropriate proceedings.” (Kittredge Sports Co. v. Superior Court (1989) 213 Cal.App.3d 1045, 1048.) In light of great liberality employed when ruling on a motion for leave to amend, the court will not normally consider the validity of the proposed amended pleading since grounds for demurrer or motion to strike are premature. Thus, absent prejudice to the opposing party, courts are bound to apply a policy of great liberality in permitting amendments to the complaint “at any stage of the proceedings, up to and including trial.” (emphasis added.) (Atkinson v. Elk Corp. (2003) 109 Cal.App.4th 739, 761.)

Notwithstanding the liberality associated with Motions for Leave to File an Amended pleading, Plaintiffs’ Motion is denied. DANIEL COLLARO was originally named as an individual defendant in this action, but a demurrer was sustained without leave to amend as to him after Plaintiffs’ were unable to allege sufficient facts to substantiate his personal liability. Trial is set for January 17, 2020, and the bulk of discovery has already occurred. Granting Plaintiffs’ request, at this stage in the litigation, would cause Defendants to suffer significant prejudice.

The Court notes that on November 12, 2019, Defendants FILED a Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer to the Third Amended Complaint. On the cover-page of their Motion, Defendants assert that the Motion for Leave is set for hearing on November 27, 2019. However, no such Motion is on calendar, and no reservation number or receipt has been provided with the Moving Papers.

Case Number: BC624566    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: SEC

TORRES, et al. v. NAVARRO, et al.

CASE NO.:  BC624566

HEARING 11/12/19

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#3

TENTATIVE ORDER

I. Defendant Collaro Property Management, Inc.’s motion to quash subpoena to Colony Specialty Ins. Co. pursuant to CCP 1987.1, or in the alternative to modify subpoena is DENIED.

II. Defendant Collaro’s motion to quash subpoena to State Farm Insurance pursuant to CCP 1987.1, or in the alternative to modify subpoena is DENIED.

Plaintiffs to give NOTICE.

Defendant Collaro Property Management, Inc.’s moves to quash the subpoena served on Colony Specialty Ins. Co. and individual Defendant Collaro moves to quash the subpoena served on State Farm Insurance pursuant to CCP 1987.1.

The operative Third Amended Complaint alleges that Defendant Navarro entered the common area of Plaintiffs’ residence with his vehicle and ran over Plaintiffs while intoxicated. Plaintiffs have alleged claims against the Collaro Defendants for failure to terminate the tenancy of individuals who engaged in criminal activity.

If a subpoena requires the attendance of a witness or the production of books, documents, electronically stored information, or other things before a court, or at the trial of an issue therein, or at the taking of a deposition, the court, upon motion reasonably made by any person described in subdivision (b), or upon the court's own motion after giving counsel notice and an opportunity to be heard, may make an order quashing the subpoena entirely, modifying it, or directing compliance with it upon those terms or conditions as the court shall declare, including protective orders. In addition, the court may make any other order as may be appropriate to protect the person from unreasonable or oppressive demands. (CCP 1987.1.)

The subpoenas seek “a copy of insurance Policy No. GL4067622, that was in effect on the day of the incident” and “any and all documents/electronically stored information that refer to, evidence, or reflect any and all reservation of rights under the policy, denial or refusal of coverage for Policy No. GL4067622, that was in effect on the day of the incident.”

Defendants contend that the “reservation of rights letters” (e.g. the reasons an insurer is denying coverage) are not reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence.

Unless limited by order of the court ... any party may obtain discovery regarding any matter, not privileged, that is relevant to the subject matter involved ... if the matter either is itself admissible in evidence or appears reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence.” (CCP § 2017.010.) Admissibility at trial is not required. Rather, the test is whether the information sought might reasonably lead to other evidence that would be admissible. (CCP § 2017.010; see Davies v. Sup.Ct. (1984) 36 C3d 291, 301.) The 'relevance to the subject matter' and 'reasonably calculated to lead to discovery of admissible evidence' standards are applied liberally. Any doubt is generally resolved in favor of permitting discovery, particularly where the precise issues in the case are not yet clearly established. (Colonial Life & Acc. Ins. Co. v. Sup.Ct. (1982) 31 Cal.3d 785, 790, fns. 7-8.)

It is unclear to this court why this information is not relevant to the action or reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of relevant evidence. The subpoena seeks any reservation of rights, denials or refusal of coverage that was “in effect on the day of the incident.” If the insurance carrier had denied prior claims or reserved certain rights based on Defendants’ actions, such may lead to the discovery of relevant evidence like notice or failure to perform.

Further, the information does not implicate Defendants’ right of privacy. Defendants have not articulated any privacy interests in the policies or the reservation of rights letters.

Finally, Defendants argue that the documents are privileged because they would “necessarily include case file notes, communications, and correspondence between Colony and Defendant, as well as counsel and others.” (Motion, 4:10-14.) However, this statement is speculative and is not supported by any evidence. Further, nothing in this statement suggests that the communications were in anticipation of litigation, or that there are any communications or notes made by counsel. If such a privileged communication exists, then Defendants may document the privilege with a privilege log.

The motions are DENIED.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COURTROOM VIEW NETWORK is a litigant

Latest cases where CT CORPORATION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where S.T. is a litigant