This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2016 at 14:15:00 (UTC).

JEROME SIMMONS, ET AL. VS. MUJAHID ABDUR RAHIM, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 JEROME SIMMONS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MUJAHID ABDUR RAHIM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO and LAURA C. ELLISON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7823

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAFAEL A. ONGKEKO

LAURA C. ELLISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BECK MARY N.

SIMMONS JEROME

Defendants

RAHIM MUJAHID ABDUR

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF VOLODAR S. KUZYK

KISTLER LAW FIRM

Defendant Attorney

KILKER PATRICK M.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/29/2013: Minute Order

APPLICATION TO ALLOW PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAUL M. KISTLER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

9/13/2013: APPLICATION TO ALLOW PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PAUL M. KISTLER IN SUPPORT THEREOF; ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

9/25/2013: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT MUJAHID ABDURRAHIM; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

11/19/2013: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT MUJAHID ABDURRAHIM; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

CIVIL DEPOSIT

11/25/2013: CIVIL DEPOSIT

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

1/31/2014: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

7/28/2014: NOTICE OF PI SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM & ORDER

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/19/2014: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

8/25/2014: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

7/22/2015: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (w/prej, complaint ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • OSC-DISMISSAL (Notice of Settlmnt) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2014
  • Notice-Settlement Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONT TD/FSC/REL DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Notice (Civil Deposit; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • Answer to Complaint Filed Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • Appl.&Order for Public. of Summons (FOR MUJAHID ABDUR RAHIM NEWSPAPER OREGONIAN NEWSPAPER RECEIPT #CCH400521047 $20.00 9-16-13 ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Substitution of Attorney (MARY N. BECK MAKES THE FOLLOWING SUBST. FORMER ATT: VOLODAR S. KUZYK NEW ATT: PAUL M. KISTLER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • Substitution of Attorney (JEROME SIMMONS MAKE THE FOLLOWING SUBST: FORMER ATT: VOLODAR S. KUZYK NEW ATT: PAUL M. KISTLER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2012
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous) Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less