This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2021 at 21:47:50 (UTC).

JEROD ZAVISTOSKI VS CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT & NIGHTCLUB

Case Summary

On 07/22/2010 JEROD ZAVISTOSKI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT NIGHTCLUB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DUKES, ROBERT A., GAIL FEUER, OKI, DAN THOMAS and SAMANTHA P. JESSNER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9220

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DUKES, ROBERT A.

GAIL FEUER

OKI, DAN THOMAS

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAVISTOSKI JEROD

Defendants

JP-JAN CORPORATION

CHWC INC

CARTEL HECTOR

D.J. EXCLUSIVE

CARTEL ENTERTAINMENT

CRAZY HORSE STEAK HOUSE AND SALOON

OLGUIN HECTOR

ORTIZ FELIPE

CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT & NIGHTCLUB

JAMES EDWARD (DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

JAMES LALO (DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

CARTEL PHILLIP

NUCCIO JOHN

ANDA JONATHAN

JAMES LALO DEFAULT JUDGMENT

JAMES EDWARD DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Not Classified By Court

LINDOERFER SANDRA ESQ

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DIDONATO LAW FIRM

FIRM DIDONATO LAW

Defendant Attorneys

ALVIREZ JEFFREY LAW OFFICES OF

LOMBARDO CATHERINE R. LAW OFFICES OF

WEINSTEIN MARK A.

Other Attorneys

PIERCE TIMOTHY L.

MASRY & VITITOE LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Other - - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL; AND NOTICE OF TEMPORARY OFFICE CLOSURE

8/31/2017: Other - - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL; AND NOTICE OF TEMPORARY OFFICE CLOSURE

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/4/2013: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/17/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT FELIPE ORTIZ OFF CALENDAR

4/22/2013: NOTICE OF TAKING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANT FELIPE ORTIZ OFF CALENDAR

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

4/25/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

Minute Order -

5/20/2013: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

6/4/2013: Minute Order -

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

6/10/2013: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL -

NOTICE OF ORJ)ER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND DEFAULT PROVE-UP

6/11/2013: NOTICE OF ORJ)ER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AND DEFAULT PROVE-UP

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CONTACT INFORMATION

6/26/2013: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND CONTACT INFORMATION

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

7/11/2013: ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?585(D) AGAINST DEFENDANT LALO JAMES AKA EDWARD JAMES SUED AS DOE 21; DECLARATION OF PETER R. DIDONATO; DECLARATION OF JEROD ZAVISTOSKY; S

12/24/2013: DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ?585(D) AGAINST DEFENDANT LALO JAMES AKA EDWARD JAMES SUED AS DOE 21; DECLARATION OF PETER R. DIDONATO; DECLARATION OF JEROD ZAVISTOSKY; S

Minute Order -

4/10/2014: Minute Order -

SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER DIDONATO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP

4/10/2014: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER DIDONATO, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROVE UP

Minute Order -

5/14/2014: Minute Order -

JUDGMENT

6/18/2014: JUDGMENT

Minute Order -

6/23/2014: Minute Order -

Minute Order -

7/30/2014: Minute Order -

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; Notice of Unavailability of Counsel; and Notice of Temporary Office Closure; Filed by Jerod Zavistoski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment (mail ); Filed by Attorney for Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Creditor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 93; (Osc Re Dismissal; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department LA93, Gail Feuer, Presiding; Osc Re Dismissal (OF REMAINING DEFENDANTS) - Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2014-08-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
313 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2010
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2010
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jerod Zavistoski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CRAZY HORSE RESTAURANT AND NIGTCLUB is a litigant

Latest cases where C.H.W.C. INC A CORPORATION DBA CRAZY HORSE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIERCE TIMOTHY L.