Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 17:56:33 (UTC).

JEREMY BRINDLEY VS WAYNE PROVISION CO, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2016 JEREMY BRINDLEY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against WAYNE PROVISION CO, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5719

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRINDLEY JEREMY

Defendants

WAYNE PROVISION CO. INC.

PREMIER MEAT COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CSILLAG ARTHUR LAW OFFICE OF

Defendant Attorney

HILL FARRER & BURRILL LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Not Held-Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (REGARDING ANSWER/RESPONSIVEPLEADING TO THE FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCEC/F 02/10/17) - Not Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JEREMY BRINDLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE; ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by JEREMY BRINDLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; (Order to Show Cause; Not Held-Continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (REGARDING ANSWER/RESPONSIVEPLEADING TO THE FIRST AMENDEDCOMPLAINT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCEC/F 01/05/17) - Not Held-Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department F, Master Calendar, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (C/F 11/30/16) - Matter heard, matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JEREMY BRINDLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by JEREMY BRINDLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON 09/15/16 Proof of Service by Mail attached ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketSummons; Filed by JEREMY BRINDLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by JEREMY BRINDLEY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketNotice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WAYNE PROVISION CO. INC. DBA PREMIER MEAT COMPANY is a litigant