This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2021 at 13:30:50 (UTC).

JENNIFER VERNON VS. ELAINE CULOTTI ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 04/18/2013 JENNIFER VERNON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELAINE CULOTTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID J. COWAN, NANCY L. NEWMAN, H. CHESTER HORN, JR. and ALLAN J. GOODMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0578

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID J. COWAN

NANCY L. NEWMAN

H. CHESTER HORN, JR.

ALLAN J. GOODMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Respondents

VERNON JENNIFER

BRILES CULOTTI TRUST PARTNERSHIP

BRILES GREG

CULOTTI ELAINE

SCAPA ROBERT B.

Appellants, Defendants and Respondents

BRILES CULOTTI TRUST PARTNERSHIP

BRILES GREG

CULOTTI ELAINE

CULOTTI GARY

HOUSE OF ROCK

SCAPA ROBERT B.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Respondent

SCAPA ROBERT B.

Trustee

BRILES FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOLDEN CRAIG E.

GLASER STEVEN

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

YEBRI SAM S.

Appellant, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GLASER STEVEN HOWARD

FRUCHTMAN CYNTHIA E.

RUDD CHRISTOPHER L.

RUDD LAW FIRM

RUSS LAW FIRM. THE

ABRAMSON JOE R.

MADONI STEPHEN A.

HURBER BURKE

MADONI STEPHEN ANGELO

SCAPA LAW GROUP PC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SCAPA LAW GROUP PC

Other Attorneys

RUDD LAW FIRM. THE

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Of Elaine Culotti

7/17/2018: Declaration - Of Elaine Culotti

Statement of Decision -

10/3/2018: Statement of Decision -

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

3/6/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

3/6/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND JUDGMENT)

Response - To Plantiff's Objection

7/6/2018: Response - To Plantiff's Objection

Ex Parte Application - To Set an Earlier Hearing Date

7/24/2018: Ex Parte Application - To Set an Earlier Hearing Date

Declaration - Of Jennifer Vernon

7/24/2018: Declaration - Of Jennifer Vernon

Joinder to Motion - To Reopen Case

8/9/2018: Joinder to Motion - To Reopen Case

Reply - To Opposition to Reopen Trial

8/20/2018: Reply - To Opposition to Reopen Trial

Notice of Ruling -

8/29/2018: Notice of Ruling -

Joinder

10/22/2018: Joinder

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: Judgment) of 11/13/2018 and minute order and judgment

11/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: Judgment) of 11/13/2018 and minute order and judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

12/3/2018: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

12/27/2018: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Notice of Appeal

12/27/2018: Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal for Notice of Appeal, filed 1/9/19

1/31/2019: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal - Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal for Notice of Appeal, filed 1/9/19

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketJudgment (IPROPOSEDI AMENDED JUDGMENT); Filed by JENNIFER VERNON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Amend Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Steven Glaser in Reply to Elaine Culotti's Opposition to Motion to Amend Judgment); Filed by JENNIFER VERNON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF ORDER ASSIGNING CASE); Filed by JENNIFER VERNON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by JENNIFER VERNON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketMotion to Amend Judgment; Filed by JENNIFER VERNON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 1:55 PM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
439 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2013
  • DocketStatement-Case Management; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department P; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Continued by Court) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by ELAINE CULOTTI (Defendant); HOUSE OF ROCK (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • DocketDemurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT "BY FAX" ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • DocketDemurrer; Filed by ROBERT B. SCAPA (Legacy Party); GREG BRILES (Defendant); BRILES CULOTTI TRUST PARTNERSHIP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JENNIFER VERNON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: SC120578    Hearing Date: March 12, 2021    Dept: P

Tentative Ruling

Vernon v. Culotti et al., Case No. SC120578

Hearing Date March 12, 2021 (continued from February 23, 2021)

Plaintiff’s Motion to Amend Judgment

On November 5, 2018 after a bench trial, this court entered a $531,871 judgment for plaintiff but declined to award prejudgment interest. Plaintiff appealed, and the Court of Appeal reversed the denial, determining plaintiff was entitled to prejudgment interest commencing on March 7, 2013. Plaintiff requests the court amend its judgment to include $299,871.00 in interest, per the Court of Appeal’s decision. GRANTED. $299,871 in prejudgment interest will be added to plaintiff’s judgment.

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO APPEAR VIA LA COURT CONNECT.

Case Number: SC120578    Hearing Date: February 23, 2021    Dept: P


Case Number: SC127112    Hearing Date: February 23, 2021    Dept: P

Tentative Rulings

Gallion v. Ringo et al., Case No. SC127112

Hearing Date January 21, 2021 (continued to February 23, 2021)

Defendants’ Demurrers to First Amended Complaint

Plaintiff alleges injuries due to leaks and mold at his residence, owned and managed by defendants. The various defendants demur to the First Amended Complaint.

Plaintiff does not oppose the demurrers, admitting the FAC is defective and requesting leave to file a second amended complaint. The court accepts the second amended complaint due to the liberal public policy favoring amendments to pleadings. See, e.g. Nestle v. Santa Monica (1972) 6 Cal.3d 920, 939. The SAC is deemed filed as of January 21, 2020. Demurrers to the FAC complaint are MOOT.

DUE TO THE ONGOING COVID-19 PANDEMIC, PARTIES AND COUNSEL ARE ENCOURAGED TO APPEAR VIA LA COURT CONNECT.