This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 00:12:48 (UTC).

JENNIFER VALDEZ VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 JENNIFER VALDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0280

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VALDEZ JENNIFER

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES WORLD AIRPORTS

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KSAJIKIAN LAW FIRM

KSAJIKIAN JOHN LAW

Defendant Attorney

SPARAGNA JACQUELINE MICHELE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/26/2018: Minute Order

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

10/16/2018: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal

Minute Order

11/7/2018: Minute Order

Order

11/7/2018: Order

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/1/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/10/2016: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

11/10/2016: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/10/2016: PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

10/12/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Jennifer Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Order (Ruling re: Motion to set aside dismissal); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's motion to set aside dismissal; Filed by Jennifer Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Complaint; Filed by Jennifer Valdez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC640280    Hearing Date: March 18, 2020    Dept: 29

Valdez v. City of Los Angeles

NOTE: THE COURT WILL NOT HEAR ORAL ARGUMENT ON THIS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STIPULATED RELIEF

The parties having stipulated to a continuance and good cause having been shown therefore (including the Court’s own assessment of the need for a continuance based on the current state of emergency arising out of the COVID-19), the Court grants the Motion to Continue Trial.

Trial is continued to 8/3/2020 at 8:30 a.m. The final status conference is continued to 7/20/2020 at 10:00 a.m.

All discovery and motion cut off dates are to be determined based on the new trial date.

The Court is ordered to give notice.